skip to content

Fazileh, Fariborz

CPSO#: 110808

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 19 Sep 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 18 Sep 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Tehran University of Medical Sciences, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
301-462 Paxton St
Port Perry ON  L9L 1L9
Phone: (905) 985-2895 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

51 Highway 105
Red Lake ON  P0V2M0
Canada
Phone: 807-727-2231
County: District of Kenora
Electoral District: 09

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Ali Gauster Schurter Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 13 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Puckrin ( CPSO# 27488 )
Dr. E. Russell ( CPSO# 59302 )
Dr. A. Brown ( CPSO# 59455 )
Dr. M. Gilmour ( CPSO# 59725 )
Dr. G. Mercer ( CPSO# 60472 )
Dr. S. Russell ( CPSO# 60638 )
Dr. M. Stewart ( CPSO# 62187 )
Dr. J. Tuck ( CPSO# 64782 )
Dr. S. Hyshka ( CPSO# 67972 )
Dr. M. Brown ( CPSO# 69023 )
Dr. S. Shepherd ( CPSO# 71354 )
Dr. N. Kazarian ( CPSO# 71482 )
Dr. R. Adams ( CPSO# 72364 )
Dr. F. Nasser-Sharif ( CPSO# 72700 )
Dr. T. Stryde ( CPSO# 73931 )
Dr. A. Chiella ( CPSO# 74700 )
Dr. F. Ali ( CPSO# 76181 )
Dr. K. Ferguson ( CPSO# 76506 )
Dr. A. Dayal ( CPSO# 79055 )
Dr. M. Schurter ( CPSO# 82718 )
Dr. S. Cull ( CPSO# 82751 )
Dr. A. Armstrong ( CPSO# 84261 )
Dr. R. Wray ( CPSO# 86630 )
Dr. A. Pawley ( CPSO# 87461 )
Dr. J. Ross ( CPSO# 88724 )
Dr. H. Nguyen ( CPSO# 88893 )
Dr. C. Westbrook ( CPSO# 89258 )
Dr. D. Wang ( CPSO# 90666 )
Dr. B. Tse ( CPSO# 91489 )
Dr. A. Gauster ( CPSO# 100273)
Dr. C. Hadden ( CPSO# 100522)
Dr. M. Golfam ( CPSO# 100808)
Dr. J. Moran ( CPSO# 100903)
Dr. A. Bruno ( CPSO# 101160)
Dr. P. Dyall ( CPSO# 104226)
Dr. N. MacDonald ( CPSO# 109547)
Dr. F. Fazileh ( CPSO# 110808)
Dr. E. Hamel ( CPSO# 112262)

Business Address:
Medical Associates of Port Perry
462 Paxton Street
Port Perry ON  L9L 1L9
Phone Number: (905) 985-2895


Corporation Name: Dr. Fariborz Fazileh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 01 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Fazileh ( CPSO# 110808)

Business Address:
51 Highway 105
Red Lake ON  P0V 2M0
Phone Number: (807) 727-2231

Business Address:
451 Paxton Street
Port Perry ON  L9L 1L9
Phone Number: (905) 985-7321

Business Address:
301 - 462 Paxton Street
Port Perry ON  L9L 1L9
Phone Number: (905) 985-2895

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health Scugog Port Perry Site Port Perry
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Lakeridge Health,Clarington Site Bowmanville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:14 Sep 2018 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. FARIBORZ FAZILEH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FAZILEH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 19 Sep 2016 to 11 Dec 2016
AVP - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 12 Dec 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 18 Sep 2017
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 19 Sep 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 18 Sep 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Dec 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 2018