skip to content

Tse, Brian Ling Bong

CPSO#: 91489

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North Durham Health Services
462 Paxton Street
Port Perry ON  L9L 1L9
Phone: (905) 985-2895
Fax: (844) 895-7499 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

15941 Simcoe Street
Port Perry ON  L9L 1N5
Canada
Phone: (905) 985-3205
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

451 Paxton Street
Port Perry ON  L9L1L9
Canada
Phone: 9059857321
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Ali Gauster Schurter Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 13 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Westbrook ( CPSO# 89258 )
Dr. P. Puckrin ( CPSO# 27488 )
Dr. R. Allin ( CPSO# 20746 )
Dr. S. Russell ( CPSO# 60638 )
Dr. M. Stewart ( CPSO# 62187 )
Dr. G. Mercer ( CPSO# 60472 )
Dr. M. Gilmour ( CPSO# 59725 )
Dr. A. Brown ( CPSO# 59455 )
Dr. J. Tuck ( CPSO# 64782 )
Dr. R. Wray ( CPSO# 86630 )
Dr. A. Chiella ( CPSO# 74700 )
Dr. H. Nguyen ( CPSO# 88893 )
Dr. K. Best ( CPSO# 75245 )
Dr. A. Armstrong ( CPSO# 84261 )
Dr. F. Nasser-Sharif ( CPSO# 72700 )
Dr. J. Ross ( CPSO# 88724 )
Dr. S. Cull ( CPSO# 82751 )
Dr. A. Dayal ( CPSO# 79055 )
Dr. K. Ferguson ( CPSO# 76506 )
Dr. N. Kazarian ( CPSO# 71482 )
Dr. S. Shepherd ( CPSO# 71354 )
Dr. A. Gauster ( CPSO# 100273)
Dr. M. Brown ( CPSO# 69023 )
Dr. P. Dyall ( CPSO# 104226)
Dr. A. Pawley ( CPSO# 87461 )
Dr. E. Russell ( CPSO# 59302 )
Dr. S. Hyshka ( CPSO# 67972 )
Dr. C. Hadden ( CPSO# 100522)
Dr. J. Moran ( CPSO# 100903)
Dr. A. Bruno ( CPSO# 101160)
Dr. D. Wang ( CPSO# 90666 )
Dr. B. Tse ( CPSO# 91489 )
Dr. F. Ali ( CPSO# 76181 )
Dr. R. Adams ( CPSO# 72364 )
Dr. M. Schurter ( CPSO# 82718 )
Dr. T. Stryde ( CPSO# 73931 )

Business Address:
Medical Associates of Port Perry
462 Paxton Street
Port Perry ON  L9L 1L9
Phone Number: (905) 985-2895


Corporation Name: Brian Tse Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 01 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Tse ( CPSO# 91489 )

Business Address:
North Durham Health Services
201 - 462 Paxton Street
Port Perry ON  L9L 1L9
Phone Number: (905) 985-2895

Business Address:
451 Paxton Street
Port Perry ON  L9L 1L9
Phone Number: (905) 985-7321

Business Address:
15941 Simcoe Street
Port Perry ON  L9L 1N5
Phone Number: (905) 985-3205

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health Scugog Port Perry Site Port Perry

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. BRIAN LING BONG TSE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TSE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2011