skip to content

Nasser-Sharif, Farah Jane

CPSO#: 72700

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2003

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Medical Associates of Port Perry
Suite 105
462 Paxton Street
Port Perry ON  L9L 1L9
Phone: (905) 985-5572
Fax: (844) 825-8571 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Farah Nasser-Sharif Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 29 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Nasser-Sharif ( CPSO# 72700 )

Business Address:
462 Paxton Street
Port Perry ON  L9L 1L9
Phone Number: (905) 985-2895


Corporation Name: Ali Gauster Schurter Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 13 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Allin ( CPSO# 20746 )
Dr. P. Puckrin ( CPSO# 27488 )
Dr. E. Russell ( CPSO# 59302 )
Dr. A. Brown ( CPSO# 59455 )
Dr. M. Gilmour ( CPSO# 59725 )
Dr. G. Mercer ( CPSO# 60472 )
Dr. S. Russell ( CPSO# 60638 )
Dr. M. Stewart ( CPSO# 62187 )
Dr. J. Tuck ( CPSO# 64782 )
Dr. S. Hyshka ( CPSO# 67972 )
Dr. M. Brown ( CPSO# 69023 )
Dr. S. Shepherd ( CPSO# 71354 )
Dr. N. Kazarian ( CPSO# 71482 )
Dr. R. Adams ( CPSO# 72364 )
Dr. F. Nasser-Sharif ( CPSO# 72700 )
Dr. T. Stryde ( CPSO# 73931 )
Dr. A. Chiella ( CPSO# 74700 )
Dr. K. Best ( CPSO# 75245 )
Dr. F. Ali ( CPSO# 76181 )
Dr. K. Ferguson ( CPSO# 76506 )
Dr. A. Dayal ( CPSO# 79055 )
Dr. M. Schurter ( CPSO# 82718 )
Dr. S. Cull ( CPSO# 82751 )
Dr. A. Armstrong ( CPSO# 84261 )
Dr. R. Wray ( CPSO# 86630 )
Dr. A. Pawley ( CPSO# 87461 )
Dr. J. Ross ( CPSO# 88724 )
Dr. H. Nguyen ( CPSO# 88893 )
Dr. C. Westbrook ( CPSO# 89258 )
Dr. D. Wang ( CPSO# 90666 )
Dr. B. Tse ( CPSO# 91489 )
Dr. A. Gauster ( CPSO# 100273)
Dr. C. Hadden ( CPSO# 100522)
Dr. J. Moran ( CPSO# 100903)
Dr. A. Bruno ( CPSO# 101160)
Dr. P. Dyall ( CPSO# 104226)

Business Address:
Medical Associates of Port Perry
462 Paxton Street
Port Perry ON  L9L 1L9
Phone Number: (905) 985-2895

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. FARAH JANE NASSER-SHARIF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NASSER-SHARIF is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2003