skip to content

Moran, Joseph Francis

CPSO#: 100903

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Medical Associates of Port Perry
462 Paxton Street
Port Perry ON  L9L 1L9
Phone: (905) 985-2895
Fax: (844) 895-7506 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Ali Gauster Schurter Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 13 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Russell ( CPSO# 59302 )
Dr. S. Hyshka ( CPSO# 67972 )
Dr. M. Brown ( CPSO# 69023 )
Dr. A. Pawley ( CPSO# 87461 )
Dr. N. Kazarian ( CPSO# 71482 )
Dr. S. Shepherd ( CPSO# 71354 )
Dr. P. Dyall ( CPSO# 104226)
Dr. A. Gauster ( CPSO# 100273)
Dr. A. Dayal ( CPSO# 79055 )
Dr. F. Nasser-Sharif ( CPSO# 72700 )
Dr. A. Chiella ( CPSO# 74700 )
Dr. K. Best ( CPSO# 75245 )
Dr. K. Ferguson ( CPSO# 76506 )
Dr. S. Cull ( CPSO# 82751 )
Dr. A. Armstrong ( CPSO# 84261 )
Dr. R. Wray ( CPSO# 86630 )
Dr. J. Ross ( CPSO# 88724 )
Dr. H. Nguyen ( CPSO# 88893 )
Dr. J. Tuck ( CPSO# 64782 )
Dr. M. Stewart ( CPSO# 62187 )
Dr. S. Russell ( CPSO# 60638 )
Dr. G. Mercer ( CPSO# 60472 )
Dr. M. Gilmour ( CPSO# 59725 )
Dr. A. Brown ( CPSO# 59455 )
Dr. R. Allin ( CPSO# 20746 )
Dr. P. Puckrin ( CPSO# 27488 )
Dr. D. Wang ( CPSO# 90666 )
Dr. B. Tse ( CPSO# 91489 )
Dr. C. Westbrook ( CPSO# 89258 )
Dr. M. Schurter ( CPSO# 82718 )
Dr. F. Ali ( CPSO# 76181 )
Dr. T. Stryde ( CPSO# 73931 )
Dr. R. Adams ( CPSO# 72364 )
Dr. C. Hadden ( CPSO# 100522)
Dr. J. Moran ( CPSO# 100903)
Dr. A. Bruno ( CPSO# 101160)

Business Address:
Medical Associates of Port Perry
462 Paxton Street
Port Perry ON  L9L 1L9
Phone Number: (905) 985-2895


Corporation Name: Dr. J Moran, Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 19 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Moran ( CPSO# 100903)

Business Address:
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 985-7321

Business Address:
451 Paxton Street
Port Perry ON  L9L 1L9
Phone Number: (905) 985-7321

Business Address:
462 Paxton Street
Port Perry ON  L9L 1L9
Phone Number: (905) 985-2895

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health Scugog Port Perry Site Port Perry
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JOSEPH FRANCIS MORAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2015