skip to content

Mercer, Gordon Richard

CPSO#: 60472

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 22 Dec 1988
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 22 Dec 1988

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Medical Associates
462 Paxton Street
Port Perry ON  L9L 1L9
Phone: (905) 985-2895 Ext. 5417
Fax: (844) 874-3524 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: G. R. Mercer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 29 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Mercer ( CPSO# 60472 )

Business Address:
462 Paxton Street
Port Perry ON  L9L 1L9
Phone Number: (905) 985-2895


Corporation Name: Ali Gauster Schurter Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 13 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Russell ( CPSO# 59302 )
Dr. S. Hyshka ( CPSO# 67972 )
Dr. M. Brown ( CPSO# 69023 )
Dr. A. Pawley ( CPSO# 87461 )
Dr. N. Kazarian ( CPSO# 71482 )
Dr. S. Shepherd ( CPSO# 71354 )
Dr. F. Nasser-Sharif ( CPSO# 72700 )
Dr. A. Gauster ( CPSO# 100273)
Dr. P. Dyall ( CPSO# 104226)
Dr. A. Dayal ( CPSO# 79055 )
Dr. A. Chiella ( CPSO# 74700 )
Dr. K. Best ( CPSO# 75245 )
Dr. K. Ferguson ( CPSO# 76506 )
Dr. S. Cull ( CPSO# 82751 )
Dr. A. Armstrong ( CPSO# 84261 )
Dr. R. Wray ( CPSO# 86630 )
Dr. J. Ross ( CPSO# 88724 )
Dr. H. Nguyen ( CPSO# 88893 )
Dr. R. Adams ( CPSO# 72364 )
Dr. J. Tuck ( CPSO# 64782 )
Dr. M. Stewart ( CPSO# 62187 )
Dr. S. Russell ( CPSO# 60638 )
Dr. G. Mercer ( CPSO# 60472 )
Dr. M. Gilmour ( CPSO# 59725 )
Dr. A. Brown ( CPSO# 59455 )
Dr. R. Allin ( CPSO# 20746 )
Dr. P. Puckrin ( CPSO# 27488 )
Dr. D. Wang ( CPSO# 90666 )
Dr. B. Tse ( CPSO# 91489 )
Dr. C. Westbrook ( CPSO# 89258 )
Dr. F. Ali ( CPSO# 76181 )
Dr. T. Stryde ( CPSO# 73931 )
Dr. M. Schurter ( CPSO# 82718 )
Dr. A. Bruno ( CPSO# 101160)
Dr. C. Hadden ( CPSO# 100522)
Dr. J. Moran ( CPSO# 100903)

Business Address:
Medical Associates of Port Perry
462 Paxton Street
Port Perry ON  L9L 1L9
Phone Number: (905) 985-2895

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health Scugog Port Perry Site Port Perry

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1987 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. GORDON RICHARD MERCER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MERCER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 1988
The CPSO will be closed for the statutory holiday on Monday, October 14, 2019. We will re-open at 8 a.m. on Tuesday, October 15.