skip to content

Dayal, Amita

CPSO#: 79055

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 2005

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Medical Associates of Port Perry
462 Paxton Street
Port Perry ON  L9L 1L9
Phone: (905) 985-2895 Ext. 5420
Fax: (844) 847-8839 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

21071 Dalton Road
Sutton ON  L0E1R0
Canada
Phone: 9057223251
Fax: 9057223422
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Amita Dayal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 29 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Dayal ( CPSO# 79055 )

Business Address:
Medical Associates of Port Perry
462 Paxton Street
Port Perry ON  L9L 1L9
Phone Number: (905) 985-2895


Corporation Name: Ali Gauster Schurter Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 13 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Westbrook ( CPSO# 89258 )
Dr. P. Puckrin ( CPSO# 27488 )
Dr. R. Allin ( CPSO# 20746 )
Dr. S. Russell ( CPSO# 60638 )
Dr. M. Stewart ( CPSO# 62187 )
Dr. G. Mercer ( CPSO# 60472 )
Dr. M. Gilmour ( CPSO# 59725 )
Dr. A. Brown ( CPSO# 59455 )
Dr. J. Tuck ( CPSO# 64782 )
Dr. R. Wray ( CPSO# 86630 )
Dr. A. Chiella ( CPSO# 74700 )
Dr. H. Nguyen ( CPSO# 88893 )
Dr. K. Best ( CPSO# 75245 )
Dr. A. Armstrong ( CPSO# 84261 )
Dr. F. Nasser-Sharif ( CPSO# 72700 )
Dr. J. Ross ( CPSO# 88724 )
Dr. S. Cull ( CPSO# 82751 )
Dr. A. Dayal ( CPSO# 79055 )
Dr. K. Ferguson ( CPSO# 76506 )
Dr. N. Kazarian ( CPSO# 71482 )
Dr. S. Shepherd ( CPSO# 71354 )
Dr. A. Gauster ( CPSO# 100273)
Dr. M. Brown ( CPSO# 69023 )
Dr. P. Dyall ( CPSO# 104226)
Dr. A. Pawley ( CPSO# 87461 )
Dr. E. Russell ( CPSO# 59302 )
Dr. S. Hyshka ( CPSO# 67972 )
Dr. C. Hadden ( CPSO# 100522)
Dr. J. Moran ( CPSO# 100903)
Dr. A. Bruno ( CPSO# 101160)
Dr. D. Wang ( CPSO# 90666 )
Dr. B. Tse ( CPSO# 91489 )
Dr. F. Ali ( CPSO# 76181 )
Dr. R. Adams ( CPSO# 72364 )
Dr. M. Schurter ( CPSO# 82718 )
Dr. T. Stryde ( CPSO# 73931 )

Business Address:
Medical Associates of Port Perry
462 Paxton Street
Port Perry ON  L9L 1L9
Phone Number: (905) 985-2895

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health Scugog Port Perry Site Port Perry

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. AMITA DAYAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAYAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2005