skip to content

Kazarian, Nancy

CPSO#: 71482

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 1999

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Medical Associates of Port Perry
462 Paxton Street
Port Perry ON  L9L 1L9
Phone: (905) 985-2895 Ext. 5416
Fax: (844) 874-3531 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Lakeridge Health Port Perry
451 Paxton Street
Port Perry ON  L9L 1L9
Canada
Phone: (905) 985-7321
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Kazarian Adams Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 29 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Kazarian ( CPSO# 71482 )
Dr. R. Adams ( CPSO# 72364 )

Business Address:
Medical Associates of Port Perry
462 Paxton Street
Port Perry ON  L9L 1L9
Phone Number: (905) 985-2895


Corporation Name: Ali Gauster Schurter Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 13 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Allin ( CPSO# 20746 )
Dr. P. Puckrin ( CPSO# 27488 )
Dr. E. Russell ( CPSO# 59302 )
Dr. A. Brown ( CPSO# 59455 )
Dr. M. Gilmour ( CPSO# 59725 )
Dr. G. Mercer ( CPSO# 60472 )
Dr. S. Russell ( CPSO# 60638 )
Dr. M. Stewart ( CPSO# 62187 )
Dr. J. Tuck ( CPSO# 64782 )
Dr. S. Hyshka ( CPSO# 67972 )
Dr. M. Brown ( CPSO# 69023 )
Dr. S. Shepherd ( CPSO# 71354 )
Dr. N. Kazarian ( CPSO# 71482 )
Dr. R. Adams ( CPSO# 72364 )
Dr. F. Nasser-Sharif ( CPSO# 72700 )
Dr. T. Stryde ( CPSO# 73931 )
Dr. A. Chiella ( CPSO# 74700 )
Dr. K. Best ( CPSO# 75245 )
Dr. F. Ali ( CPSO# 76181 )
Dr. K. Ferguson ( CPSO# 76506 )
Dr. A. Dayal ( CPSO# 79055 )
Dr. M. Schurter ( CPSO# 82718 )
Dr. S. Cull ( CPSO# 82751 )
Dr. A. Armstrong ( CPSO# 84261 )
Dr. R. Wray ( CPSO# 86630 )
Dr. A. Pawley ( CPSO# 87461 )
Dr. J. Ross ( CPSO# 88724 )
Dr. H. Nguyen ( CPSO# 88893 )
Dr. C. Westbrook ( CPSO# 89258 )
Dr. D. Wang ( CPSO# 90666 )
Dr. B. Tse ( CPSO# 91489 )
Dr. A. Gauster ( CPSO# 100273)
Dr. C. Hadden ( CPSO# 100522)
Dr. J. Moran ( CPSO# 100903)
Dr. A. Bruno ( CPSO# 101160)
Dr. P. Dyall ( CPSO# 104226)

Business Address:
Medical Associates of Port Perry
462 Paxton Street
Port Perry ON  L9L 1L9
Phone Number: (905) 985-2895

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health Scugog Port Perry Site Port Perry

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NANCY KAZARIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAZARIAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1999