skip to content

Visram, Aleem Nurdin

CPSO#: 109972

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2022

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: University of Limerick School of Medicin, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
462 Paxton St
Medical Associates of Port Perry
Port Perry ON  L9L 1L9
Phone: 905-985-2895 Ext. 5413
Fax: 1-844-203-4217 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Ali Gauster Schurter Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 13 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Allin ( CPSO# 20746 )
Dr. P. Puckrin ( CPSO# 27488 )
Dr. E. Russell ( CPSO# 59302 )
Dr. M. Gilmour ( CPSO# 59725 )
Dr. G. Mercer ( CPSO# 60472 )
Dr. S. Russell ( CPSO# 60638 )
Dr. M. Stewart ( CPSO# 62187 )
Dr. J. Tuck ( CPSO# 64782 )
Dr. S. Hyshka ( CPSO# 67972 )
Dr. M. Brown ( CPSO# 69023 )
Dr. S. Shepherd ( CPSO# 71354 )
Dr. N. Kazarian ( CPSO# 71482 )
Dr. R. Adams ( CPSO# 72364 )
Dr. F. Nasser-Sharif ( CPSO# 72700 )
Dr. T. Stryde ( CPSO# 73931 )
Dr. A. Chiella ( CPSO# 74700 )
Dr. K. Best ( CPSO# 75245 )
Dr. F. Ali ( CPSO# 76181 )
Dr. K. Ferguson ( CPSO# 76506 )
Dr. A. Dayal ( CPSO# 79055 )
Dr. M. Schurter ( CPSO# 82718 )
Dr. S. Cull ( CPSO# 82751 )
Dr. A. Armstrong ( CPSO# 84261 )
Dr. R. Wray ( CPSO# 86630 )
Dr. A. Pawley ( CPSO# 87461 )
Dr. J. Ross ( CPSO# 88724 )
Dr. H. Nguyen ( CPSO# 88893 )
Dr. C. Westbrook ( CPSO# 89258 )
Dr. D. Wang ( CPSO# 90666 )
Dr. B. Tse ( CPSO# 91489 )
Dr. A. Gauster ( CPSO# 100273)
Dr. C. Hadden ( CPSO# 100522)
Dr. M. Golfam ( CPSO# 100808)
Dr. J. Moran ( CPSO# 100903)
Dr. P. Dyall ( CPSO# 104226)
Dr. N. MacDonald ( CPSO# 109547)
Dr. A. Visram ( CPSO# 109972)
Dr. F. Fazileh ( CPSO# 110808)
Dr. E. Hamel ( CPSO# 112262)
Dr. M. La Delfa ( CPSO# 120638)
Dr. C. Lajeunesse ( CPSO# 121641)

Business Address:
Medical Associates of Port Perry
462 Paxton Street
Port Perry ON  L9L 1L9
Phone Number: (905) 985-2895


Corporation Name: Dr. Aleem Nurdin Visram Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 08 2022

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Visram ( CPSO# 109972)

Business Address:
462 Paxton St
Port Perry ON  L9L 1L9
Phone Number: 905-985-2895

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
Lakeridge Health Scugog Port Perry Site Port Perry

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2022 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ALEEM NURDIN VISRAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VISRAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 22 Sep 2016
AVP - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2022