skip to content

Russell, Elizabeth Mae

CPSO#: 59302

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 1988
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 16 Oct 1989

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Knapper, Elizabeth Mae (used until: 20 Nov 1990 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
462 Paxton Street
Port Perry ON  L9L 1L9
Phone: (905) 985-2895 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Ali Gauster Schurter Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 13 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Hadden ( CPSO# 100522)
Dr. J. Moran ( CPSO# 100903)
Dr. A. Bruno ( CPSO# 101160)
Dr. F. Ali ( CPSO# 76181 )
Dr. R. Adams ( CPSO# 72364 )
Dr. T. Stryde ( CPSO# 73931 )
Dr. C. Westbrook ( CPSO# 89258 )
Dr. M. Schurter ( CPSO# 82718 )
Dr. D. Wang ( CPSO# 90666 )
Dr. B. Tse ( CPSO# 91489 )
Dr. P. Puckrin ( CPSO# 27488 )
Dr. R. Allin ( CPSO# 20746 )
Dr. A. Brown ( CPSO# 59455 )
Dr. S. Russell ( CPSO# 60638 )
Dr. M. Gilmour ( CPSO# 59725 )
Dr. G. Mercer ( CPSO# 60472 )
Dr. M. Stewart ( CPSO# 62187 )
Dr. J. Tuck ( CPSO# 64782 )
Dr. H. Nguyen ( CPSO# 88893 )
Dr. J. Ross ( CPSO# 88724 )
Dr. S. Cull ( CPSO# 82751 )
Dr. K. Best ( CPSO# 75245 )
Dr. K. Ferguson ( CPSO# 76506 )
Dr. R. Wray ( CPSO# 86630 )
Dr. A. Armstrong ( CPSO# 84261 )
Dr. F. Nasser-Sharif ( CPSO# 72700 )
Dr. A. Chiella ( CPSO# 74700 )
Dr. A. Dayal ( CPSO# 79055 )
Dr. A. Gauster ( CPSO# 100273)
Dr. N. Kazarian ( CPSO# 71482 )
Dr. S. Shepherd ( CPSO# 71354 )
Dr. P. Dyall ( CPSO# 104226)
Dr. M. Brown ( CPSO# 69023 )
Dr. A. Pawley ( CPSO# 87461 )
Dr. S. Hyshka ( CPSO# 67972 )
Dr. E. Russell ( CPSO# 59302 )

Business Address:
Medical Associates of Port Perry
462 Paxton Street
Port Perry ON  L9L 1L9
Phone Number: (905) 985-2895


Corporation Name: Russell and Russell Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 24 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Russell ( CPSO# 60638 )
Dr. E. Russell ( CPSO# 59302 )

Business Address:
Medical Associates of Port Perry
462 Paxton Street
Port Perry ON  L9L 1L9
Phone Number: (905) 985-2895

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ELIZABETH MAE RUSSELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUSSELL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Nov 1990 to 28 Feb 1991
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Oct 1989