skip to content

Bruno, Adrian Joseph

CPSO#: 101160

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 29 Mar 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: McMaster University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
200 Fletcher Cres
Stevenson Memorial Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
Alliston ON  L9R 1M1
Phone: (705) 435-6281 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

95 Bayly St W B 03
Ajax ON  L1S 7K8
Canada
Phone: (905) 426-2028
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

1822 Whites Rd
Pickering ON  L1V 4M1
Canada
Phone: (905) 492-8222
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

400-13291 Yonge St
Richmond Hill ON  L4E 4L6
Canada
Phone: (289) 234-6772
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

A7-9135 Keele St
Concord ON  L4K 0J4
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

C2-2 Champagne Dr
North Toronto Eye Surgery
North York ON  M3J 0K2
Canada
Phone: (416) 792-3043
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

206-5 Quarry Ridge Rd
Lumea
Barrie ON  L4M 7G1
Canada
Phone: 1-705-300-0741
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

B19-2 Champagne Dr
North York Endoscopy
North York ON  M3J 0K2
Canada
Phone: 416-645-5145
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

500 Huronia Road
Barrie ON  L4N 8X3
Canada
Phone: 1 877-230-2020
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

1692 Lakeshore Road West
Mississauga ON  L5J 1J5
Canada
Phone: (905) 274-2032
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

55 Mountainash Road
Brampton ON  L6R 1W4
Canada
Phone: (365) 747-1470
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

17730 Leslie Street
Newmarket ON  L3Y 4W4
Canada
Phone: (289) 803-9119
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

1112 Saint Andrews Drive
Midland ON  L4R 4L9
Canada
Phone: (705) 526-1300
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

340 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 3A9
Canada
Phone: (416) 928-9511
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Ali Gauster Schurter Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 13 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Puckrin ( CPSO# 27488 )
Dr. E. Russell ( CPSO# 59302 )
Dr. A. Brown ( CPSO# 59455 )
Dr. M. Gilmour ( CPSO# 59725 )
Dr. G. Mercer ( CPSO# 60472 )
Dr. S. Russell ( CPSO# 60638 )
Dr. M. Stewart ( CPSO# 62187 )
Dr. J. Tuck ( CPSO# 64782 )
Dr. S. Hyshka ( CPSO# 67972 )
Dr. M. Brown ( CPSO# 69023 )
Dr. S. Shepherd ( CPSO# 71354 )
Dr. N. Kazarian ( CPSO# 71482 )
Dr. R. Adams ( CPSO# 72364 )
Dr. F. Nasser-Sharif ( CPSO# 72700 )
Dr. T. Stryde ( CPSO# 73931 )
Dr. A. Chiella ( CPSO# 74700 )
Dr. F. Ali ( CPSO# 76181 )
Dr. K. Ferguson ( CPSO# 76506 )
Dr. A. Dayal ( CPSO# 79055 )
Dr. M. Schurter ( CPSO# 82718 )
Dr. S. Cull ( CPSO# 82751 )
Dr. A. Armstrong ( CPSO# 84261 )
Dr. R. Wray ( CPSO# 86630 )
Dr. A. Pawley ( CPSO# 87461 )
Dr. J. Ross ( CPSO# 88724 )
Dr. H. Nguyen ( CPSO# 88893 )
Dr. C. Westbrook ( CPSO# 89258 )
Dr. D. Wang ( CPSO# 90666 )
Dr. B. Tse ( CPSO# 91489 )
Dr. A. Gauster ( CPSO# 100273)
Dr. C. Hadden ( CPSO# 100522)
Dr. M. Golfam ( CPSO# 100808)
Dr. J. Moran ( CPSO# 100903)
Dr. A. Bruno ( CPSO# 101160)
Dr. P. Dyall ( CPSO# 104226)
Dr. N. MacDonald ( CPSO# 109547)
Dr. F. Fazileh ( CPSO# 110808)
Dr. E. Hamel ( CPSO# 112262)

Business Address:
Medical Associates of Port Perry
462 Paxton Street
Port Perry ON  L9L 1L9
Phone Number: (905) 985-2895


Corporation Name: Dr. Adrian Joseph Bruno Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 23 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Bruno ( CPSO# 101160)

Business Address:
462 Paxton Street
Port Perry ON  L9L 1L9
Phone Number: (905) 985-2895

Business Address:
200 Fletcher Cres
Alliston ON  L9R 1M1

Business Address:
451 Paxton Street
Port Perry ON  L9L 1L9
Phone Number: (905) 985-7321

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Campbellford Memorial Hospital Campbellford
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland
Headwaters Health Care Centre Orangeville
Lakeridge Health Scugog Port Perry Site Port Perry
Lakeridge Health,Clarington Site Bowmanville
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Stevenson Memorial Hospital Alliston
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg
University Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:15 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ADRIAN JOSEPH BRUNO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRUNO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Mar 2016