skip to content

Dyall, Pamela Jayne

CPSO#: 104226

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 21 Jul 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Queensland, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Medical Associates of Port Perry
462 Paxton Street
Suite 107
Port Perry ON  L9L 1L9
Phone: 905-985-2895 Ext. 5420
Fax: 844-726-7591 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Ali Gauster Schurter Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 13 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Allin ( CPSO# 20746 )
Dr. P. Puckrin ( CPSO# 27488 )
Dr. E. Russell ( CPSO# 59302 )
Dr. A. Brown ( CPSO# 59455 )
Dr. M. Gilmour ( CPSO# 59725 )
Dr. G. Mercer ( CPSO# 60472 )
Dr. S. Russell ( CPSO# 60638 )
Dr. M. Stewart ( CPSO# 62187 )
Dr. J. Tuck ( CPSO# 64782 )
Dr. S. Hyshka ( CPSO# 67972 )
Dr. M. Brown ( CPSO# 69023 )
Dr. S. Shepherd ( CPSO# 71354 )
Dr. N. Kazarian ( CPSO# 71482 )
Dr. R. Adams ( CPSO# 72364 )
Dr. F. Nasser-Sharif ( CPSO# 72700 )
Dr. T. Stryde ( CPSO# 73931 )
Dr. A. Chiella ( CPSO# 74700 )
Dr. K. Best ( CPSO# 75245 )
Dr. F. Ali ( CPSO# 76181 )
Dr. K. Ferguson ( CPSO# 76506 )
Dr. A. Dayal ( CPSO# 79055 )
Dr. M. Schurter ( CPSO# 82718 )
Dr. S. Cull ( CPSO# 82751 )
Dr. A. Armstrong ( CPSO# 84261 )
Dr. R. Wray ( CPSO# 86630 )
Dr. A. Pawley ( CPSO# 87461 )
Dr. J. Ross ( CPSO# 88724 )
Dr. H. Nguyen ( CPSO# 88893 )
Dr. C. Westbrook ( CPSO# 89258 )
Dr. D. Wang ( CPSO# 90666 )
Dr. B. Tse ( CPSO# 91489 )
Dr. A. Gauster ( CPSO# 100273)
Dr. C. Hadden ( CPSO# 100522)
Dr. J. Moran ( CPSO# 100903)
Dr. A. Bruno ( CPSO# 101160)
Dr. P. Dyall ( CPSO# 104226)

Business Address:
Medical Associates of Port Perry
462 Paxton Street
Port Perry ON  L9L 1L9
Phone Number: (905) 985-2895

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health Scugog Port Perry Site Port Perry

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jul 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. PAMELA JAYNE DYALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DYALL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 22 Sep 2014
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 24 Jul 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 2016