skip to content

Allin, Robert Clare

CPSO#: 20746

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Jun 1967
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 1967

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
462 Paxton Street
Port Perry ON  L9L 1L9
Phone: (905) 985-2895 Ext. 5412
Fax: (844) 825-5930 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: R. Allin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 12 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Allin ( CPSO# 20746 )

Business Address:
462 Paxton Street
Port Perry ON  L9L 1L9
Phone Number: (905) 985-2895


Corporation Name: Ali Gauster Schurter Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 13 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Hadden ( CPSO# 100522)
Dr. J. Moran ( CPSO# 100903)
Dr. A. Bruno ( CPSO# 101160)
Dr. R. Adams ( CPSO# 72364 )
Dr. F. Ali ( CPSO# 76181 )
Dr. M. Stewart ( CPSO# 62187 )
Dr. M. Gilmour ( CPSO# 59725 )
Dr. A. Brown ( CPSO# 59455 )
Dr. F. Nasser-Sharif ( CPSO# 72700 )
Dr. P. Dyall ( CPSO# 104226)
Dr. T. Stryde ( CPSO# 73931 )
Dr. M. Schurter ( CPSO# 82718 )
Dr. D. Wang ( CPSO# 90666 )
Dr. B. Tse ( CPSO# 91489 )
Dr. C. Westbrook ( CPSO# 89258 )
Dr. P. Puckrin ( CPSO# 27488 )
Dr. R. Allin ( CPSO# 20746 )
Dr. S. Russell ( CPSO# 60638 )
Dr. G. Mercer ( CPSO# 60472 )
Dr. J. Tuck ( CPSO# 64782 )
Dr. J. Ross ( CPSO# 88724 )
Dr. R. Wray ( CPSO# 86630 )
Dr. H. Nguyen ( CPSO# 88893 )
Dr. A. Chiella ( CPSO# 74700 )
Dr. K. Ferguson ( CPSO# 76506 )
Dr. S. Cull ( CPSO# 82751 )
Dr. A. Armstrong ( CPSO# 84261 )
Dr. K. Best ( CPSO# 75245 )
Dr. A. Dayal ( CPSO# 79055 )
Dr. A. Gauster ( CPSO# 100273)
Dr. A. Pawley ( CPSO# 87461 )
Dr. N. Kazarian ( CPSO# 71482 )
Dr. S. Shepherd ( CPSO# 71354 )
Dr. S. Hyshka ( CPSO# 67972 )
Dr. M. Brown ( CPSO# 69023 )
Dr. E. Russell ( CPSO# 59302 )

Business Address:
Medical Associates of Port Perry
462 Paxton Street
Port Perry ON  L9L 1L9
Phone Number: (905) 985-2895

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health Scugog Port Perry Site Port Perry
Lakeridge Health,Clarington Site Bowmanville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1972 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ROBERT CLARE ALLIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALLIN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1965
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1967