skip to content

Ali, Fahim Husayn

CPSO#: 76181

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 21 Dec 2019
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:Queen's University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Medical Associates of Port Perry
462 Paxton Street
Port Perry ON  L9L 1L9
Phone: (905) 985-2895
Fax: (844) 840-2475 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Ross Memorial Hospital
10 Angeline Street North
Kawartha Lakes, Ontario
Lindsay ON  K9V 4M8
Canada
Phone: (705) 324-6111
County: County of Victoria
Electoral District: 06

Lakeridge Health Port Perry
451 Paxton Street
Port Perry, Ontario
Port Perry ON  L9L 1L9
Canada
Phone: (905) 985-7321
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Taunton Surgical Centre
1290 Keith Ross Drive
Oshawa ON  L1H 7K4
Canada
Phone: (905) 576-3444
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Durham EndoSurgery Centre
95 Bayly Street West
Suite B03
Ajax ON  L1S 7K8
Canada
Phone: (905) 426-2028
Fax: (905) 426-2033
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Dr. Craig & Associates
310 Bridge Street West
Napanee ON  K7R 2G3
Canada
Phone: (613) 354-6294
County: County of Lennox and Addington
Electoral District: 06

Dr. Sami Ullah
371 Kent Street West
Lindsay ON  K9V 2Z7
Canada
Phone: (705) 324-7150
County: County of Victoria
Electoral District: 06

Rudd Clinic
Suite 400
123 Edward Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1E2
Canada
Phone: 416-597-0997
Fax: 416-597-2912
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Brampton Endoscopy Centre
Suite A-7
10886 Hurontario Street
Brampton ON  L7A3R9
Canada
Phone: 905-495-5200
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Ancaster Endoscopy Clinic
Suite 205
1144 Wislon Street West
Ancaster ON  L9G3K9
Canada
Phone: 905-304-0062
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Advance Endoscopy & Specialist
Centre, Suite 303
2227 South Millway
Mississauga ON  L5L3R6
Canada
Phone: 905-569-7007
Fax: 905-569-7056
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Grand Genesis Health
Unit 12, Level 2
9080 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C0Y7
Canada
Phone: 289-597-7676
Fax: 289-597-7675
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Oakville Provis-Rudd Clinic
Suite 202
710 Dorval Drive
Oakville ON  L6K3V2
Canada
Phone: 905-607-0022
Fax: 905-607-0013
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Weeneebayko Hospital
19 Hospital Drive
Moose Factory, Ontario
Moose Factory ON  P0L 1W0
Canada
Phone: (705) 658-1111
County: Territorial District of Cochrane
Electoral District: 08

Georgetown Hospital
1 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown, Ontario
Georgetown ON  L7G 2B8
Canada
Phone: 905-873-0111
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Fahim Ali Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 05 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Ali ( CPSO# 76181 )

Business Address:
206 - 95 Bayly Street
Ajax ON  L1S 7K8
Phone Number: (905) 426-2028

Business Address:
462 Paxton Street
Port Perry ON  L9L 1L9
Phone Number: (905) 985-2895

Business Address:
451 Paxton Street
Port Perry ON  L9L 1L8
Phone Number: (905) 985-7321

Business Address:
310 Bridge Street West
Napanee ON  K7R 2G3
Phone Number: (613) 354-6294

Business Address:
371 Kent Street West
Lindsay ON  K9V 2Z7
Phone Number: (705) 324-7150


Corporation Name: Ali Gauster Schurter Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 13 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Allin ( CPSO# 20746 )
Dr. P. Puckrin ( CPSO# 27488 )
Dr. E. Russell ( CPSO# 59302 )
Dr. A. Brown ( CPSO# 59455 )
Dr. M. Gilmour ( CPSO# 59725 )
Dr. G. Mercer ( CPSO# 60472 )
Dr. S. Russell ( CPSO# 60638 )
Dr. M. Stewart ( CPSO# 62187 )
Dr. J. Tuck ( CPSO# 64782 )
Dr. S. Hyshka ( CPSO# 67972 )
Dr. M. Brown ( CPSO# 69023 )
Dr. S. Shepherd ( CPSO# 71354 )
Dr. N. Kazarian ( CPSO# 71482 )
Dr. R. Adams ( CPSO# 72364 )
Dr. F. Nasser-Sharif ( CPSO# 72700 )
Dr. T. Stryde ( CPSO# 73931 )
Dr. A. Chiella ( CPSO# 74700 )
Dr. K. Best ( CPSO# 75245 )
Dr. F. Ali ( CPSO# 76181 )
Dr. K. Ferguson ( CPSO# 76506 )
Dr. A. Dayal ( CPSO# 79055 )
Dr. M. Schurter ( CPSO# 82718 )
Dr. S. Cull ( CPSO# 82751 )
Dr. A. Armstrong ( CPSO# 84261 )
Dr. R. Wray ( CPSO# 86630 )
Dr. A. Pawley ( CPSO# 87461 )
Dr. J. Ross ( CPSO# 88724 )
Dr. H. Nguyen ( CPSO# 88893 )
Dr. C. Westbrook ( CPSO# 89258 )
Dr. D. Wang ( CPSO# 90666 )
Dr. B. Tse ( CPSO# 91489 )
Dr. A. Gauster ( CPSO# 100273)
Dr. C. Hadden ( CPSO# 100522)
Dr. J. Moran ( CPSO# 100903)
Dr. A. Bruno ( CPSO# 101160)
Dr. P. Dyall ( CPSO# 104226)

Business Address:
Medical Associates of Port Perry
462 Paxton Street
Port Perry ON  L9L 1L9
Phone Number: (905) 985-2895

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
Lakeridge Health Scugog Port Perry Site Port Perry
Lakeridge Health,Clarington Site Bowmanville
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay
Weeneebayko Area Health Authority,Moose Factory Site Moose Factory

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Dec 2003 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Dec 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Dec 2004
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jan 2004
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Dec 2019
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 21 Dec 2019

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 21 Dec 2019 Active
             As from December 21, 2019, the following is imposed as terms, conditions and
            limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Fahim Husayn Ali in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Ali to the College of
            Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:


                               UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                            ("Undertaking")
                                                  of
                                         DR. FAHIM HUSAYN ALI
                                              ("Dr. Ali")
                                                  to 
                             COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                            (the "College")



            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the
                  College;

                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Ali, certificate of registration number 76181, am a member of the
                  College.  

            (3)   I, Dr. Ali, acknowledge that the College conducted an investigation
                  bearing File Number 1105542 (the "Investigation") into whether I engaged
                  in professional misconduct and/or am incompetent in my family medicine
                  practice, specifically in my anesthesiology practice.  

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Ali, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective immediately.

            (5)   Professional Education  

                  (a)   I, Dr. Ali, undertake to participate in and successfully complete
                        all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as Appendix "B",
                        including all of the following professional education (the
                        "Professional Education"):
                  
                        (i)   An Anesthesia Crisis Resource Management Course acceptable to
                              the College; 
                        (ii)  Review of the Canadian Anesthesiologists' Society Guidelines
                              to the Practice of Anesthesia. Canadian Journal of
                              Anesthesia. January 2019; Volume 66, Issue 1: 75-108; and 
                        (iii) any additional professional education recommended by my
                              Clinical Supervisor.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Ali, undertake to provide proof to the College of my
                        successful completion of the Professional Education, including
                        proof of registration and attendance and participant assessment
                        reports, within one (1) month of completing it. I acknowledge that
                        the College will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have
                        successfully completed the Professional Education.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Ali, undertake to complete this requirement within four (4)
                        months, or, if no satisfactory program is available by that time,
                        at the first possible opportunity thereafter.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Ali, acknowledge that a report or reports may be provided to
                        the College regarding my progress and compliance with the
                        Professional Education.
                  
            (6)   Clinical Supervision

                  (a)   I, Dr. Ali, undertake to engage a clinical supervisor acceptable to
                        the College (the "Clinical Supervisor" or "Clinical Supervisors"),
                        to meet with me and review my completion of the Professional
                        Education outlined above.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Ali, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor's undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "A", and
                        understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor. The
                        Clinical Supervisor will, at minimum: 
                  
                        (i)   Meet with me at my Practice Location, or another location
                              approved by the College, once following my completion of the
                              Professional Education in section (5) above;
                        (ii)  Discuss my management of the case that led to the
                              investigation, and my learnings from completion of the
                              Professional Education in section (5) above; 
                        (iii) Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and
                              ongoing professional development; 
                        (iv)  Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents
                              or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the
                              Clinical Supervisor deems necessary; and
                        (v)   Submit a written report to the College after our meeting. 
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Ali, undertake to cooperate fully with the meeting,
                        conducted under the term of this Undertaking and Appendix "A" to
                        this Undertaking, and to abide by the recommendations of my
                        Clinical Supervisor, including but not limited to, any recommended
                        practice improvements and ongoing professional development.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Ali, undertake to ensure that Appendix "A" to this
                        Undertaking is signed and delivered to the College within thirty
                        (30) days of the date I execute this Undertaking.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Ali, undertake that if a person who has given an undertaking
                        in Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is unable or unwilling to
                        fulfill its provisions, I shall, within twenty (20) days of
                        receiving notice of same, obtain an executed undertaking in the
                        same form from a similarly qualified person who is acceptable to
                        the College and ensure that it is delivered to the College within
                        that time.
                  
            (7)   Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Ali, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location at which I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Independent
                        Health Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction
                        (collectively my "Practice Location" or "Practice Locations"),
                        within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward,
                        I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new
                        Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at
                        that location.
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (8)   I, Dr. Ali, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to in
                  this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (9)   I, Dr. Ali, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible
                  for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the
                  implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking. 

            (10)  I, Dr. Ali, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions of
                  this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in
                  reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do
                  so.

            (11)  I, Dr. Ali, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking to
                  any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at any
                  Practice Location ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs of Staff").

            (12)  I, Dr. Ali, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            (13)  I, Dr. Ali, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (14)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Ali, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Ali, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking being
                        posted in accordance with section (14)(a) above, the following
                        summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the time
                        period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                        A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Ali engaged
                        in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in his family
                        medicine practice, specifically in his anesthesia practice. As a
                        result of the investigation:
                  
                              Dr. Ali will engage in professional education in crisis
                              management of anesthesia emergencies. 
                  
                              Dr. Ali will engage a Clinical Supervisor to review his
                              completion of the professional education. 
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Ali, acknowledge that this Undertaking remains in effect
                        until the College determines its terms are satisfied.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (15)  I, Dr. Ali, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to any person who requires this information for the
                  purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education and
                  to all Clinical Supervisor:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (16)  I, Dr. Ali, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (17)  I, Dr. Ali, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who facilitate my
                  completion of the Professional Education, and to all Clinical Supervisor,
                  and Chiefs of Staff, to disclose to the College, and to one another, any
                  of the following:

                  (a)   any information relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information relevant to the provisions of the Clinical
                        Supervisor's undertaking set out at Appendix "A" to this
                        Undertaking;
                  
                  (c)   any information relevant for the purposes of monitoring my
                        compliance with this Undertaking; and/or  
                  
                  (d)   any information which comes to their attention in the course of
                        providing the Professional Education and which they reasonably
                        believe indicates a potential risk of harm to my patients.

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: Member
Active Date: December 21, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Fahim Husayn Ali to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective December 21, 2019:

A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Ali engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in his family medicine practice, specifically in his anesthesia practice. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Ali will engage in professional education in crisis management of anesthesia emergencies.

Dr. Ali will engage a Clinical Supervisor to review his completion of the professional education.
`