THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 20:13:20 PM
Fazileh, Fariborz
CPSO#:
110808
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
19 Sep 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
18 Sep 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Tehran University of Medical Sciences, 2013
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
47 Liberty St S
Lakeridge Health Bowmanville Hospit
Emergency department
Bowmanville ON L1C 2N4
Phone: (905)623-3331
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Lakeridge Health Scugog Port Perry Site |
Port Perry |
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site |
Ajax |
Lakeridge Health,Clarington Site |
Bowmanville |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:14 Sep 2018 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. FARIBORZ FAZILEH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FAZILEH is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 19 Sep 2016 to 11 Dec 2016
AVP - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 12 Dec 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 18 Sep 2017
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 19 Sep 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 18 Sep 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 19 Sep 2016 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 12 Dec 2016 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Sep 2018 |