skip to content

Jimenez Juan, Laura

CPSO#: 87503

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 13 Apr 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 13 Apr 2012
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Italian, Spanish

Education:Universidad Miguel Hernandez, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Medical Imaging
2075 Bayview Ave
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100 Ext. 85389
Fax: (416) 480-6033 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Christakis Arenson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 29 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Jong ( CPSO# 23271 )
Dr. A. Arenson ( CPSO# 32995 )
Dr. M. Christakis ( CPSO# 62099 )
Dr. J. Sarrazin ( CPSO# 66362 )
Dr. C. McGregor ( CPSO# 70337 )
Dr. E. David ( CPSO# 71504 )
Dr. M. Machnowska ( CPSO# 92153 )
Dr. N. Curpen ( CPSO# 78380 )
Dr. E. Martinovic ( CPSO# 76031 )
Dr. A. Oikonomou ( CPSO# 76829 )
Dr. K. Hack ( CPSO# 81145 )
Dr. L. Richmond ( CPSO# 81154 )
Dr. C. Betel ( CPSO# 73485 )
Dr. L. Probyn ( CPSO# 73373 )
Dr. H. Ghandehari ( CPSO# 84625 )
Dr. M. Skarpathiotakis ( CPSO# 84703 )
Dr. L. Jimenez Juan ( CPSO# 87503 )
Dr. S. Symons ( CPSO# 69225 )
Dr. A. Moody ( CPSO# 63017 )
Dr. P. Hamilton ( CPSO# 55254 )
Dr. J. Rubenstein ( CPSO# 29908 )
Dr. C. Heyn ( CPSO# 88810 )
Dr. R. Wolfson ( CPSO# 86607 )
Dr. P. Jabehdar Maralani ( CPSO# 84825 )
Dr. R. Yeung ( CPSO# 83681 )
Dr. P. Howard ( CPSO# 74992 )
Dr. R. Aviv ( CPSO# 78068 )
Dr. C. Patel ( CPSO# 96861 )
Dr. C. Dey ( CPSO# 94397 )
Dr. F. Berger ( CPSO# 110670)
Dr. R. Pugash ( CPSO# 53910 )
Dr. P. Glanc ( CPSO# 55972 )
Dr. J. Wall ( CPSO# 57057 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Room MG100
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-5862

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 07 Mar 2019 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2007 to 02 Oct 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 03 Oct 2007 to 31 Jul 2008
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 29 Aug 2011 to 13 Apr 2012
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Oct 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Apr 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Apr 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Mar 2019

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 07 Mar 2019 Active
             Dr.  Laura  Jimenez  Juan  may  practise  medicine  independently in diagnostic
            radiology.