skip to content

Bharatha, Aditya

CPSO#: 79389

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-6060
Fax: (416) 864-5380 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Common Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 20 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Montanera ( CPSO# 31960 )
Dr. F. Goldberg ( CPSO# 50752 )
Dr. T. Marotta ( CPSO# 53911 )
Dr. D. Marcuzzi ( CPSO# 54207 )
Dr. T. Dowdell ( CPSO# 55456 )
Dr. B. Gray ( CPSO# 58202 )
Dr. A. Common ( CPSO# 59024 )
Dr. D. Muradali ( CPSO# 59826 )
Dr. L. Noel De Tilly ( CPSO# 62846 )
Dr. D. Pearce ( CPSO# 65503 )
Dr. A. Kirpalani ( CPSO# 74950 )
Dr. D. Sarma ( CPSO# 76653 )
Dr. A. Bharatha ( CPSO# 79389 )
Dr. E. Colak ( CPSO# 79512 )
Dr. V. Prabhudesai ( CPSO# 81446 )
Dr. W. Mak ( CPSO# 85186 )
Dr. L. Jimenez Juan ( CPSO# 87503 )
Dr. P. Vlachou ( CPSO# 90004 )
Dr. A. Lin ( CPSO# 90557 )
Dr. D. Deva ( CPSO# 93514 )
Dr. N. Ditkofsky ( CPSO# 97540 )
Dr. G. Huang ( CPSO# 113235)
Dr. M. Wu ( CPSO# 116216)

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5680


Corporation Name: Bharatha Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 29 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Bharatha ( CPSO# 79389 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
Room 3-077CC
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-6060

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Neuroradiology Effective:30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ADITYA BHARATHA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BHARATHA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neuroradiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 7 - Neuroradiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008