skip to content

Kirpalani, Anish

CPSO#: 74950

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 21 Jul 2005
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 21 Jul 2005

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:McMaster University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
3rd Floor
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5692
Fax: (416) 864-5380 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

301-45 Sheppard Ave E
MyHealth Centre
North York ON  M2N 5W9
Canada
Phone: (416) 964-6253
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Common Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 20 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Montanera ( CPSO# 31960 )
Dr. F. Goldberg ( CPSO# 50752 )
Dr. T. Marotta ( CPSO# 53911 )
Dr. D. Marcuzzi ( CPSO# 54207 )
Dr. T. Dowdell ( CPSO# 55456 )
Dr. B. Gray ( CPSO# 58202 )
Dr. A. Common ( CPSO# 59024 )
Dr. D. Muradali ( CPSO# 59826 )
Dr. L. Noel De Tilly ( CPSO# 62846 )
Dr. D. Pearce ( CPSO# 65503 )
Dr. A. Kirpalani ( CPSO# 74950 )
Dr. D. Sarma ( CPSO# 76653 )
Dr. A. Bharatha ( CPSO# 79389 )
Dr. E. Colak ( CPSO# 79512 )
Dr. V. Prabhudesai ( CPSO# 81446 )
Dr. W. Mak ( CPSO# 85186 )
Dr. P. Vlachou ( CPSO# 90004 )
Dr. A. Lin ( CPSO# 90557 )
Dr. D. Deva ( CPSO# 93514 )
Dr. N. Ditkofsky ( CPSO# 97540 )
Dr. G. Huang ( CPSO# 113235)

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5680


Corporation Name: Dr. Kirpalani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 27 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Kirpalani ( CPSO# 74950 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
Diagnostic Imaging
30 Bond Street
Room CC3-075
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5692

Business Address:
301-45 Sheppard Ave E
MyHealth Centre
North York ON  M2N 5W9

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Providence Health Care,Toronto Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANISH KIRPALANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIRPALANI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 2005