skip to content

Deva, Djeven Parameshvara

CPSO#: 93514

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 May 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 May 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Dublin, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
30 Bond St
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-6060 Ext. 3243 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Common Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 20 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Montanera ( CPSO# 31960 )
Dr. F. Goldberg ( CPSO# 50752 )
Dr. T. Marotta ( CPSO# 53911 )
Dr. D. Marcuzzi ( CPSO# 54207 )
Dr. T. Dowdell ( CPSO# 55456 )
Dr. B. Gray ( CPSO# 58202 )
Dr. A. Common ( CPSO# 59024 )
Dr. D. Muradali ( CPSO# 59826 )
Dr. L. Noel De Tilly ( CPSO# 62846 )
Dr. D. Pearce ( CPSO# 65503 )
Dr. A. Kirpalani ( CPSO# 74950 )
Dr. D. Sarma ( CPSO# 76653 )
Dr. A. Bharatha ( CPSO# 79389 )
Dr. E. Colak ( CPSO# 79512 )
Dr. V. Prabhudesai ( CPSO# 81446 )
Dr. W. Mak ( CPSO# 85186 )
Dr. L. Jimenez Juan ( CPSO# 87503 )
Dr. P. Vlachou ( CPSO# 90004 )
Dr. A. Lin ( CPSO# 90557 )
Dr. D. Deva ( CPSO# 93514 )
Dr. N. Ditkofsky ( CPSO# 97540 )
Dr. G. Huang ( CPSO# 113235)
Dr. M. Wu ( CPSO# 116216)

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5680


Corporation Name: Deva Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 26 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Deva ( CPSO# 93514 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-6060

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:22 Mar 2019 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 15 Sep 2010
PEAP - CF - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 16 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Jan 2013
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2013 to 30 Apr 2013
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 May 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Aug 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Mar 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 22 Mar 2019 Active
             Dr. Djeven Parameshvara Deva may practise medicine independently in diagnostic
            radiology.