skip to content

Sarma, Dipanka

CPSO#: 76653

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 17 Oct 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 17 Oct 2007

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:Gauhati University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
Division of Neuroradiology
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-6060 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Common Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 20 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Montanera ( CPSO# 31960 )
Dr. F. Goldberg ( CPSO# 50752 )
Dr. T. Marotta ( CPSO# 53911 )
Dr. D. Marcuzzi ( CPSO# 54207 )
Dr. T. Dowdell ( CPSO# 55456 )
Dr. B. Gray ( CPSO# 58202 )
Dr. A. Common ( CPSO# 59024 )
Dr. D. Muradali ( CPSO# 59826 )
Dr. L. Noel De Tilly ( CPSO# 62846 )
Dr. D. Pearce ( CPSO# 65503 )
Dr. A. Kirpalani ( CPSO# 74950 )
Dr. D. Sarma ( CPSO# 76653 )
Dr. A. Bharatha ( CPSO# 79389 )
Dr. E. Colak ( CPSO# 79512 )
Dr. V. Prabhudesai ( CPSO# 81446 )
Dr. W. Mak ( CPSO# 85186 )
Dr. P. Vlachou ( CPSO# 90004 )
Dr. A. Lin ( CPSO# 90557 )
Dr. D. Deva ( CPSO# 93514 )
Dr. N. Ditkofsky ( CPSO# 97540 )
Dr. G. Huang ( CPSO# 113235)

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5680


Corporation Name: Sarma Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 04 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Sarma ( CPSO# 76653 )
Dr. S. Sarma ( CPSO# 109450)

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
Division of Neuroradiology
3079 CC - 30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5029

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:17 Oct 2007 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
CF - Neuroradiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
CF - Neuroradiology

Western University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Sep 2003
PEAP - CF - Neuroradiology

Western University, 01 Oct 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
CF - Neuroradiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Sep 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Sep 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Oct 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Feb 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 22 Feb 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 22 Feb 2013 Active
             Dr. Dipanka Sarma may practice medicine independently in neuroradiology, only.