skip to content

Tafur Arciniegas, Monica

CPSO#: 110154

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Oct 2019
EXPIRY DATE
30 Sep 2026
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Oct 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education: Pontificia Universidad Javeriana, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Michael's Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
30 Bond St
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5692
Fax: (416) 864-5380 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Common Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 20 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Montanera ( CPSO# 31960 )
Dr. F. Goldberg ( CPSO# 50752 )
Dr. T. Marotta ( CPSO# 53911 )
Dr. D. Marcuzzi ( CPSO# 54207 )
Dr. T. Dowdell ( CPSO# 55456 )
Dr. B. Gray ( CPSO# 58202 )
Dr. A. Common ( CPSO# 59024 )
Dr. D. Muradali ( CPSO# 59826 )
Dr. L. Noel De Tilly ( CPSO# 62846 )
Dr. D. Pearce ( CPSO# 65503 )
Dr. A. Kirpalani ( CPSO# 74950 )
Dr. D. Sarma ( CPSO# 76653 )
Dr. A. Bharatha ( CPSO# 79389 )
Dr. E. Colak ( CPSO# 79512 )
Dr. V. Prabhudesai ( CPSO# 81446 )
Dr. W. Mak ( CPSO# 85186 )
Dr. L. Jimenez Juan ( CPSO# 87503 )
Dr. P. Vlachou ( CPSO# 90004 )
Dr. A. Lin ( CPSO# 90557 )
Dr. D. Deva ( CPSO# 93514 )
Dr. N. Ditkofsky ( CPSO# 97540 )
Dr. S. Mathur ( CPSO# 104335)
Dr. M. Tafur Arciniegas ( CPSO# 110154)
Dr. G. Huang ( CPSO# 113235)
Dr. M. Wu ( CPSO# 116216)

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5680


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Colombia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:01 Oct 2019 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 22 Sep 2016
PEAP - CF - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Sep 2019
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2019
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 30 Sep 2022
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Sep 2026

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Feb 2022 Active
 1.    Dr. Monica Tafur Arciniegas may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medical
                        Imaging,  Division  of Abdominal and Women's Imaging, University of
                        Toronto,  in  which  Dr.   Tafur   Arciniegas   holds  an  academic
                        appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The  certificate of registration automatically expires seven  years  from
                  the date  of  issuance  or  when Dr. Tafur Arciniegas no longer holds the
                  academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration  automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee  renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Tafur Arciniegas'
                        clinical  performance,  knowledge,  skill,  judgment,  professional
                        conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  Committee  does not receive an annual  report  or  receives  a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee  makes  a  decision  about Dr. Tafur Arciniegas'
                        certificate  of  registration,  following  consideration   of   the
                        practice assessment report. 
                  
                  
            Note: This  certificate is issued on October 1, 2019. In accordance with paragraphs
                       2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the Registration Committee, 
                       automatically expire on September 30, 2026.