skip to content

Vlachou, Paraskevi

CPSO#: 90004

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 02 Nov 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 02 Nov 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Greek

Education:University of Leicester, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Medical Imaging
St. Michael`s Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 360-4000 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Common Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 20 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Montanera ( CPSO# 31960 )
Dr. F. Goldberg ( CPSO# 50752 )
Dr. T. Marotta ( CPSO# 53911 )
Dr. D. Marcuzzi ( CPSO# 54207 )
Dr. T. Dowdell ( CPSO# 55456 )
Dr. B. Gray ( CPSO# 58202 )
Dr. A. Common ( CPSO# 59024 )
Dr. D. Muradali ( CPSO# 59826 )
Dr. L. Noel De Tilly ( CPSO# 62846 )
Dr. D. Pearce ( CPSO# 65503 )
Dr. A. Kirpalani ( CPSO# 74950 )
Dr. D. Sarma ( CPSO# 76653 )
Dr. A. Bharatha ( CPSO# 79389 )
Dr. E. Colak ( CPSO# 79512 )
Dr. V. Prabhudesai ( CPSO# 81446 )
Dr. W. Mak ( CPSO# 85186 )
Dr. L. Jimenez Juan ( CPSO# 87503 )
Dr. P. Vlachou ( CPSO# 90004 )
Dr. A. Lin ( CPSO# 90557 )
Dr. D. Deva ( CPSO# 93514 )
Dr. N. Ditkofsky ( CPSO# 97540 )
Dr. G. Huang ( CPSO# 113235)
Dr. M. Wu ( CPSO# 116216)

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5680


Corporation Name: Paraskevi Vlachou Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 22 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Vlachou ( CPSO# 90004 )

Business Address:
Department of Medical Imaging
St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 360-4000


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:02 Nov 2013 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:11 Jun 2021 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2008 to 12 Dec 2008
PEAP - CF - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 13 Dec 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 29 Sep 2012
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 01 Nov 2013
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Dec 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Sep 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Apr 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Nov 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Nov 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Aug 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 06 Aug 2020
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration Expiry Date: 01 Nov 2021
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Jun 2021

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 11 Jun 2021 Active
 Dr. PARASKEVI VLACHOU may practise medicine independently in diagnostic radiology.