skip to content

Common, Andrew Ainslie

CPSO#: 59024

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 02 Oct 1987
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 05 Feb 1988

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
Department Of Diagnostic Imaging
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5680
Fax: (416) 864-5380 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Common Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 20 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Montanera ( CPSO# 31960 )
Dr. F. Goldberg ( CPSO# 50752 )
Dr. T. Marotta ( CPSO# 53911 )
Dr. D. Marcuzzi ( CPSO# 54207 )
Dr. T. Dowdell ( CPSO# 55456 )
Dr. B. Gray ( CPSO# 58202 )
Dr. A. Common ( CPSO# 59024 )
Dr. D. Muradali ( CPSO# 59826 )
Dr. L. Noel De Tilly ( CPSO# 62846 )
Dr. D. Pearce ( CPSO# 65503 )
Dr. A. Kirpalani ( CPSO# 74950 )
Dr. D. Sarma ( CPSO# 76653 )
Dr. A. Bharatha ( CPSO# 79389 )
Dr. E. Colak ( CPSO# 79512 )
Dr. V. Prabhudesai ( CPSO# 81446 )
Dr. W. Mak ( CPSO# 85186 )
Dr. L. Jimenez Juan ( CPSO# 87503 )
Dr. P. Vlachou ( CPSO# 90004 )
Dr. A. Lin ( CPSO# 90557 )
Dr. D. Deva ( CPSO# 93514 )
Dr. N. Ditkofsky ( CPSO# 97540 )
Dr. G. Huang ( CPSO# 113235)
Dr. M. Wu ( CPSO# 116216)

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5680


Corporation Name: Dr. Andrew Common Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 22 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Common ( CPSO# 59024 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
30 Bond Street
Room 3-145CC
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5680

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:20 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANDREW AINSLIE COMMON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COMMON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Oct 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Feb 1988