skip to content

Noel De Tilly, Lyne

CPSO#: 62846

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 03 Jul 1990
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1992

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Université Laval Faculté de Médecine, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
Radiology Department
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5674
Fax: (416) 864-5380 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Common Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 20 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Montanera ( CPSO# 31960 )
Dr. F. Goldberg ( CPSO# 50752 )
Dr. T. Marotta ( CPSO# 53911 )
Dr. D. Marcuzzi ( CPSO# 54207 )
Dr. T. Dowdell ( CPSO# 55456 )
Dr. B. Gray ( CPSO# 58202 )
Dr. A. Common ( CPSO# 59024 )
Dr. D. Muradali ( CPSO# 59826 )
Dr. L. Noel De Tilly ( CPSO# 62846 )
Dr. D. Pearce ( CPSO# 65503 )
Dr. A. Kirpalani ( CPSO# 74950 )
Dr. D. Sarma ( CPSO# 76653 )
Dr. A. Bharatha ( CPSO# 79389 )
Dr. E. Colak ( CPSO# 79512 )
Dr. V. Prabhudesai ( CPSO# 81446 )
Dr. W. Mak ( CPSO# 85186 )
Dr. L. Jimenez Juan ( CPSO# 87503 )
Dr. P. Vlachou ( CPSO# 90004 )
Dr. A. Lin ( CPSO# 90557 )
Dr. D. Deva ( CPSO# 93514 )
Dr. N. Ditkofsky ( CPSO# 97540 )
Dr. G. Huang ( CPSO# 113235)
Dr. M. Wu ( CPSO# 116216)

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5680


Corporation Name: Noel De Tilly Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 05 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Noel De Tilly ( CPSO# 62846 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5674

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:15 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LYNE NOEL DE TILLY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NOEL DE TILLY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1992