skip to content

Mathur, Shobhit

CPSO#: 104335

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Aug 2019
EXPIRY DATE
31 Jul 2026
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Aug 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: Baroda University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University of Toronto
Department of Medical Imaging
263 McCaul St
4th Floor
Toronto ON  M5T 1W7
Phone: (416) 978-6801 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Common Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 20 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Montanera ( CPSO# 31960 )
Dr. F. Goldberg ( CPSO# 50752 )
Dr. T. Marotta ( CPSO# 53911 )
Dr. D. Marcuzzi ( CPSO# 54207 )
Dr. T. Dowdell ( CPSO# 55456 )
Dr. B. Gray ( CPSO# 58202 )
Dr. A. Common ( CPSO# 59024 )
Dr. D. Muradali ( CPSO# 59826 )
Dr. L. Noel De Tilly ( CPSO# 62846 )
Dr. D. Pearce ( CPSO# 65503 )
Dr. A. Kirpalani ( CPSO# 74950 )
Dr. D. Sarma ( CPSO# 76653 )
Dr. A. Bharatha ( CPSO# 79389 )
Dr. E. Colak ( CPSO# 79512 )
Dr. V. Prabhudesai ( CPSO# 81446 )
Dr. W. Mak ( CPSO# 85186 )
Dr. L. Jimenez Juan ( CPSO# 87503 )
Dr. P. Vlachou ( CPSO# 90004 )
Dr. A. Lin ( CPSO# 90557 )
Dr. D. Deva ( CPSO# 93514 )
Dr. N. Ditkofsky ( CPSO# 97540 )
Dr. S. Mathur ( CPSO# 104335)
Dr. M. Tafur Arciniegas ( CPSO# 110154)
Dr. G. Huang ( CPSO# 113235)
Dr. M. Wu ( CPSO# 116216)

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5680


Corporation Name: Dr. S. Mathur Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 31 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Mathur ( CPSO# 104335)

Business Address:
University of Toronto
Department of Medical Imaging
4th Floor
263 McCaul Street
Toronto ON  M5T 1W7


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



India

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Providence Health Care,Toronto Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:01 Aug 2019 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 22 Aug 2014
PEAP - CF - Neuroradiology

University of Toronto, 23 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Neuroradiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Neuroradiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Aug 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Aug 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2019
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 31 Jul 2022
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Jul 2026

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 02 Feb 2022 Active
 1. Dr. SHOBHIT MATHUR may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medical Imaging, Division of Emergency & Acute Care Radiology, University of Toronto, in which Dr. MATHUR holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. MATHUR no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. MATHUR's clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. MATHUR's certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 01 August, 2019. In accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the Registration Committee, automatically expire on 31 July, 2026.