THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 19:35:45 PM
Sarma, Dipanka
CPSO#:
76653
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Oct 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
17 Oct 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi
Education: Gauhati University, 1983
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
Division of Neuroradiology
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-6060
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Michael's Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:17 Oct 2007 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
CF - Neuroradiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
CF - Neuroradiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Sep 2003
PEAP - CF - Neuroradiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Oct 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
CF - Neuroradiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2001 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 24 Jul 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2004 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Sep 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Sep 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 17 Oct 2007 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 22 Feb 2013 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 22 Feb 2013 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 22 Feb 2013 |
|
Active |