THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 7:44:08 AM
Jimenez Juan, Laura
CPSO#:
87503
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
13 Apr 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
13 Apr 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Italian, Spanish
Education: Universidad Miguel Hernandez, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Department of Medical Imaging 3-052
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Michael's Hospital |
Toronto |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:07 Mar 2019 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2007 to 02 Oct 2007
PEAP - CF - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 03 Oct 2007 to 31 Jul 2008
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 29 Aug 2011 to 13 Apr 2012
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 03 Oct 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Jul 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 04 Oct 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 13 Apr 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 13 Apr 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 07 Mar 2019 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 07 Mar 2019 |
|
Active |