skip to content

Mak, Walter Hin Hua

CPSO#: 85186

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Jun 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Michael's Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5692
Fax: (416) 864-5380 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Common Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 20 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Noel De Tilly ( CPSO# 62846 )
Dr. D. Pearce ( CPSO# 65503 )
Dr. P. Vlachou ( CPSO# 90004 )
Dr. A. Lin ( CPSO# 90557 )
Dr. D. Muradali ( CPSO# 59826 )
Dr. A. Common ( CPSO# 59024 )
Dr. B. Gray ( CPSO# 58202 )
Dr. T. Dowdell ( CPSO# 55456 )
Dr. D. Marcuzzi ( CPSO# 54207 )
Dr. T. Marotta ( CPSO# 53911 )
Dr. A. Zalev ( CPSO# 24495 )
Dr. F. Goldberg ( CPSO# 50752 )
Dr. W. Montanera ( CPSO# 31960 )
Dr. D. Deva ( CPSO# 93514 )
Dr. V. Prabhudesai ( CPSO# 81446 )
Dr. E. Colak ( CPSO# 79512 )
Dr. A. Bharatha ( CPSO# 79389 )
Dr. A. Kirpalani ( CPSO# 74950 )
Dr. D. Sarma ( CPSO# 76653 )
Dr. W. Mak ( CPSO# 85186 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5680


Corporation Name: Walter Mak Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 04 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Mak ( CPSO# 85186 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
30 Bond Street
Suite 3-002
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5692

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. WALTER HIN HUA MAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2008