skip to content

Lin, Amy Wei

CPSO#: 90557

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michaels Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-6060 Ext. 3480 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Common Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 20 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Lin ( CPSO# 90557 )
Dr. V. Prabhudesai ( CPSO# 81446 )
Dr. L. Noel De Tilly ( CPSO# 62846 )
Dr. E. Colak ( CPSO# 79512 )
Dr. A. Bharatha ( CPSO# 79389 )
Dr. D. Pearce ( CPSO# 65503 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5680


Corporation Name: Amy Lin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 30 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Lin ( CPSO# 90557 )

Business Address:
St Michael's Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5656

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Neuroradiology Effective: 27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. AMY WEI LIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neuroradiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 7 - Neuroradiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014