skip to content

Deva, Djeven Parameshvara

CPSO#: 93514

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 May 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 May 2013
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Dublin, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
30 Bond St
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-6060 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Deva Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 26 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Deva ( CPSO# 93514 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-6060

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 22 Mar 2019 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 15 Sep 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 16 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Jan 2013
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2013 to 30 Apr 2013
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 May 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Aug 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration Expiry Date: 30 Apr 2020
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Mar 2019
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration Expiry Date: 30 Apr 2020

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 22 Mar 2019 Active
             Dr. Djeven Parameshvara Deva may practise medicine independently in diagnostic
            radiology.