THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 2:11:45 AM
Vlachou, Paraskevi
CPSO#:
90004
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
02 Nov 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
02 Nov 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Greek
Education: University of Leicester, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Department of Medical Imaging
St. Michael`s Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 360-4000
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Michael's Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:02 Nov 2013 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:11 Jun 2021 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2008 to 12 Dec 2008
PEAP - CF - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 13 Dec 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 29 Sep 2012
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 01 Nov 2013
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 31 Oct 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Dec 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 30 Sep 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 29 Sep 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 26 Apr 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Nov 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 02 Nov 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 02 Aug 2016 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 06 Aug 2020 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 11 Jun 2021 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 11 Jun 2021 |
|
Active |