skip to content

Pour Afkari, Marina

CPSO#: 113558

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Dec 2020
EXPIRY DATE
30 Jun 2026
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Dec 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education: SHAHEED BEHESHTI UNIVERSITY, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
166 Brock St
Hôtel Dieu Hospital
Radiology Department
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone: (613) 544-3400 Ext. 3025 Electoral District: 06

Additional Practice Location(s)

Hôtel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock St
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Canada
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

Providence Care Hospital
752 King St W
Kingston ON  K7L 4X3
Canada
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

135 Ontario St
Kingston ON  K7L 0A5
Canada
Phone: 6479360600
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Abraham, Islam, Mussari, Soboleski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 8 2021
Corporation Name: MARINA POUR AFKARI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 05 2022

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Pour Afkari ( CPSO# 113558)

Business Address:
31 Timberlane Dr
North York ON  M3H 1J3

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:01 Dec 2020 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2017 to 13 Nov 2017
PEAP - CF - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 14 Nov 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 31 Jul 2018
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 31 Jul 2019
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Nov 2020
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Nov 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2020
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2026

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 19 Apr 2023 Active
 1. Dr. MARINA POUR AFKARI may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Department of Diagnostic Radiology at Queen's University, in which Dr. POUR AFKARI holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. POUR AFKARI no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. POUR AFKARI's clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. POUR AFKARI's certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 01 December, 2020, and expires on 30 June, 2026. Upon renewal of Dr. POUR AFKARI's academic appointment at Queen's University, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.