skip to content

Menard, Alexandre Samuel

CPSO#: 79021

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 25 Feb 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Radiology
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 549-6666 Electoral District: 06

Additional Practice Location(s)

776 Blackburn News
Kingston ON  K7P 2N7
Canada
Phone: (613) 384-1220
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Abraham, Islam, Mussari, Soboleski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 09 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Dabreo ( CPSO# 93188 )
Dr. E. Sauerbrei ( CPSO# 28818 )
Dr. O. Islam ( CPSO# 69179 )
Dr. B. Mussari ( CPSO# 65429 )
Dr. D. Jabs ( CPSO# 70253 )
Dr. D. Soboleski ( CPSO# 59427 )
Dr. D. Rumbolt ( CPSO# 93048 )
Dr. J. Ricketts ( CPSO# 66593 )
Dr. F. Cheeseman ( CPSO# 59183 )
Dr. C. Scott ( CPSO# 79597 )
Dr. P. Fenton ( CPSO# 54474 )
Dr. A. Nasirzadeh ( CPSO# 93879 )
Dr. A. Menard ( CPSO# 79021 )
Dr. I. Silver ( CPSO# 79178 )
Dr. J. Flood ( CPSO# 81434 )
Dr. G. Dhillon ( CPSO# 84503 )
Dr. R. Butler ( CPSO# 86184 )
Dr. C. Abraham ( CPSO# 70151 )

Business Address:
776 Blackburn Mews East
Kingston ON  K7P 2N7
Phone Number: (613) 384-1220

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 549-6666

Business Address:
HDH
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3310

Business Address:
SMOL 752 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 4X3

Business Address:
835 Princess Street
Kingston ON  K7L 1G7
Phone Number: (613) 549-8775

Business Address:
191 Portsmouth Avenue
Kingston ON  K7M 8A6
Phone Number: (613) 548-4417


Corporation Name: Dr. A. Menard Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 10 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Menard ( CPSO# 79021 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 549-6666

Business Address:
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3310

Business Address:
776 Blackburn Mews
Kingston ON  K7P 2N7
Phone Number: (613) 384-1220

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ALEXANDRE SAMUEL MENARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MENARD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Feb 2009