skip to content

Soboleski, Donald Allen Anthony

CPSO#: 59427

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 22 Jul 1992
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 22 Jul 1992

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone: (613) 544-3310
Fax: (613) 544-6505 Electoral District: 06

Additional Practice Location(s)

Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Canada
Phone: (613) 548-2301
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

KMRI
776 Blackburn Mews East
Kingston ON  K7P 2N7
Canada
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Soboleski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 29 2014
Corporation Name: Abraham, Islam, Mussari, Soboleski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 09 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Rumbolt ( CPSO# 93048 )
Dr. D. Dabreo ( CPSO# 93188 )
Dr. C. Abraham ( CPSO# 70151 )
Dr. O. Islam ( CPSO# 69179 )
Dr. J. Ricketts ( CPSO# 66593 )
Dr. B. Mussari ( CPSO# 65429 )
Dr. D. Soboleski ( CPSO# 59427 )
Dr. F. Cheeseman ( CPSO# 59183 )
Dr. P. Fenton ( CPSO# 54474 )
Dr. E. Sauerbrei ( CPSO# 28818 )
Dr. J. Flood ( CPSO# 81434 )
Dr. C. Scott ( CPSO# 79597 )
Dr. A. Menard ( CPSO# 79021 )
Dr. I. Silver ( CPSO# 79178 )
Dr. R. Butler ( CPSO# 86184 )
Dr. G. Dhillon ( CPSO# 84503 )
Dr. A. Nasirzadeh ( CPSO# 93879 )
Dr. D. Jabs ( CPSO# 70253 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 549-6666

Business Address:
HDH
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3310

Business Address:
SMOL 752 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 4X3

Business Address:
776 Blackburn Mews East
Kingston ON  K7P 2N7
Phone Number: (613) 384-1220

Business Address:
835 Princess Street
Kingston ON  K7L 1G7
Phone Number: (613) 549-8775

Business Address:
191 Portsmouth Avenue
Kingston ON  K7M 8A6
Phone Number: (613) 548-4417


Corporation Name: D. Soboleski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 03 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Soboleski ( CPSO# 59427 )

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3310

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 548-2301

Business Address:
KMI X-Ray
776 Blackburn Mews East
Kingston ON  K7P 2N7
Phone Number: (613) 384-1220

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 29 May 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DONALD ALLEN ANTHONY SOBOLESKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOBOLESKI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 1992