skip to content

Haider, Maera

CPSO#: 123457

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 05 Mar 2021
EXPIRY DATE
30 Jun 2027
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 05 Mar 2021

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education: Aga Khan University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston Health Sciences Centre
Department of Diagnostic Radiology
76 Stuart St
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Abraham, Islam, Mussari, Soboleski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 09 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Sauerbrei ( CPSO# 28818 )
Dr. P. Fenton ( CPSO# 54474 )
Dr. F. Cheeseman ( CPSO# 59183 )
Dr. D. Soboleski ( CPSO# 59427 )
Dr. B. Mussari ( CPSO# 65429 )
Dr. J. Ricketts ( CPSO# 66593 )
Dr. O. Islam ( CPSO# 69179 )
Dr. C. Abraham ( CPSO# 70151 )
Dr. D. Jabs ( CPSO# 70253 )
Dr. A. Menard ( CPSO# 79021 )
Dr. I. Silver ( CPSO# 79178 )
Dr. C. Scott ( CPSO# 79597 )
Dr. J. Flood ( CPSO# 81434 )
Dr. G. Dhillon ( CPSO# 84503 )
Dr. R. Butler ( CPSO# 86184 )
Dr. D. Rumbolt ( CPSO# 93048 )
Dr. D. DaBreo ( CPSO# 93188 )
Dr. A. Nasirzadeh ( CPSO# 93879 )
Dr. B. Kwan ( CPSO# 97914 )
Dr. A. Chung ( CPSO# 98193 )
Dr. E. Tarulli ( CPSO# 98475 )
Dr. A. Gallo Hoyos ( CPSO# 99262 )
Dr. M. Pour Afkari ( CPSO# 113558)
Dr. D. Tampieri ( CPSO# 114793)
Dr. J. Ortiz Jimenez ( CPSO# 120667)
Dr. M. Nasir ( CPSO# 123355)
Dr. M. Haider ( CPSO# 123457)
Dr. H. Douis ( CPSO# 125010)

Business Address:
No business address available


Corporation Name: MAERA HAIDER MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 01 2024

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Haider ( CPSO# 123457)

Business Address:
413 Westgate Court
Kingston ON  K7P 0E4
Phone Number: 4168280424

Business Address:
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: 6135483232

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:05 Mar 2021 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Mar 2021
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Mar 2021
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2023
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2027

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 31 May 2024 Active
 1. Dr. MAERA HAIDER may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Diagnostic Radiology, Queen's University, in which Dr. HAIDER holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. HAIDER no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. HAIDER's clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. HAIDER's certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 05 March, 2021, and expires on 30 June, 2027. Upon renewal of Dr. HAIDER's academic appointment at Queen's University, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.