skip to content

Silver, Ian Michael Francis

CPSO#: 79178

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education: Queen's University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dept of Diagnostic Radiology
Queen's University
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 549-6666 Ext. 2301
Fax: (613) 548-2412 Electoral District: 06

Additional Practice Location(s)

Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston, Ontario
K7L 5G2
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Canada
Phone: (613) 544-3310 Ext. 3020
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

Kingston MRI
776 Blackburn Mews East
Kingston ON  K7P 2N7
Canada
Phone: (613) 384-1220 Ext. 901
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

7111 Syntex Drive
3rd Floor
Mississauga ON  L5N 8C3
Canada
Phone: 888-590-5069
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

237 Barton Street East
Hamilton General Hospital
Radiology Experts
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Canada
Phone: (905) 521-2111
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

5709 Hazeldean Road
Avantia Medical Imaging & Restorati
Unit 2
Ottawa ON  K2S 0P6
Canada
Phone: (613) 714-1000
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

10 Kingsbridge Garden Circle
GNMI
Mississauga ON  L5R 3K7
Canada
Phone: (905) 568-3768
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

300 Harwood Avenue South
GNMI
Ajax ON  L1S 2J1
Canada
Phone: (905) 426-8976
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Abraham, Islam, Mussari, Soboleski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 09 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Sauerbrei ( CPSO# 28818 )
Dr. P. Fenton ( CPSO# 54474 )
Dr. F. Cheeseman ( CPSO# 59183 )
Dr. D. Soboleski ( CPSO# 59427 )
Dr. B. Mussari ( CPSO# 65429 )
Dr. J. Ricketts ( CPSO# 66593 )
Dr. O. Islam ( CPSO# 69179 )
Dr. C. Abraham ( CPSO# 70151 )
Dr. D. Jabs ( CPSO# 70253 )
Dr. A. Menard ( CPSO# 79021 )
Dr. I. Silver ( CPSO# 79178 )
Dr. C. Scott ( CPSO# 79597 )
Dr. J. Flood ( CPSO# 81434 )
Dr. G. Dhillon ( CPSO# 84503 )
Dr. R. Butler ( CPSO# 86184 )
Dr. D. Rumbolt ( CPSO# 93048 )
Dr. D. DaBreo ( CPSO# 93188 )
Dr. A. Nasirzadeh ( CPSO# 93879 )
Dr. B. Kwan ( CPSO# 97914 )
Dr. A. Chung ( CPSO# 98193 )
Dr. E. Tarulli ( CPSO# 98475 )
Dr. A. Gallo Hoyos ( CPSO# 99262 )
Dr. M. Pour Afkari ( CPSO# 113558)
Dr. D. Tampieri ( CPSO# 114793)
Dr. J. Ortiz Jimenez ( CPSO# 120667)
Dr. M. Nasir ( CPSO# 123355)
Dr. M. Haider ( CPSO# 123457)
Dr. H. Douis ( CPSO# 125010)

Business Address:
No business address available


Corporation Name: Ian Silver Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 08 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Silver ( CPSO# 79178 )

Business Address:
Department of Diagnostic Radiology
Queen's University
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 548-2301

Business Address:
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3310

Business Address:
776 Blackburn Mews East
Kingston ON  K7P 2N7
Phone Number: (613) 384-1220

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
Deep River and District Hospital Deep River
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland
Haldimand War Memorial Hospital Dunnville
Hanover and District Hospital Hanover
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Listowel Memorial Hospital Listowel
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Perth
Providence Care Centre Kingston
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. IAN MICHAEL FRANCIS SILVER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SILVER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Neuroradiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008