THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 22:01:57 PM
Pour Afkari, Marina
CPSO#:
113558
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Dec 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
01 Dec 2020
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: SHAHEED BEHESHTI UNIVERSITY, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
166 Brock St
Hôtel Dieu Hospital
Radiology Department
Kingston ON K7L 5G2
Phone: (613) 544-3400 Ext. 3025
Electoral District: 06
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:01 Dec 2020 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2017 to 13 Nov 2017
PEAP - CF - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 14 Nov 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 31 Jul 2018
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 31 Jul 2019
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Nov 2020
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 2017 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Nov 2017 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Nov 2020 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Dec 2020 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2026 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 19 Apr 2023 |
|
Active |