skip to content

Tampieri, Donatella

CPSO#: 114793

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 04 May 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 21 Sep 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Italian

Education:University of Bologna, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Radiology
76 Stuart St
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 548-3232 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Abraham, Islam, Mussari, Soboleski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 09 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Sauerbrei ( CPSO# 28818 )
Dr. P. Fenton ( CPSO# 54474 )
Dr. F. Cheeseman ( CPSO# 59183 )
Dr. D. Soboleski ( CPSO# 59427 )
Dr. B. Mussari ( CPSO# 65429 )
Dr. J. Ricketts ( CPSO# 66593 )
Dr. O. Islam ( CPSO# 69179 )
Dr. C. Abraham ( CPSO# 70151 )
Dr. D. Jabs ( CPSO# 70253 )
Dr. A. Menard ( CPSO# 79021 )
Dr. I. Silver ( CPSO# 79178 )
Dr. C. Scott ( CPSO# 79597 )
Dr. J. Flood ( CPSO# 81434 )
Dr. G. Dhillon ( CPSO# 84503 )
Dr. R. Butler ( CPSO# 86184 )
Dr. D. Rumbolt ( CPSO# 93048 )
Dr. D. DaBreo ( CPSO# 93188 )
Dr. A. Nasirzadeh ( CPSO# 93879 )
Dr. B. Kwan ( CPSO# 97914 )
Dr. A. Chung ( CPSO# 98193 )
Dr. E. Tarulli ( CPSO# 98475 )
Dr. D. Tampieri ( CPSO# 114793)

Business Address:
835 Princess Street
Kingston ON  K7L 1G7
Phone Number: (613) 549-8775

Business Address:
191 Portsmouth Avenue
Kingston ON  K7M 8A6
Phone Number: (613) 548-4417

Business Address:
776 Blackburn Mews East
Kingston ON  K7P 2N7
Phone Number: (613) 384-1220

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 549-6666

Business Address:
HDH
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3310

Business Address:
SMOL 752 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 4X3


Corporation Name: D. Tampieri Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 13 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Tampieri ( CPSO# 114793)

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Radiology
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 548-3232


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:01 Aug 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DONATELLA TAMPIERI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAMPIERI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 May 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 2018