skip to content

Jabs, Doris Kirsten

CPSO#: 70253

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Medical Imaging
KHSC
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone: (613) 544-3400 Ext. 3020 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Abraham, Islam, Mussari, Soboleski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 09 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Scott ( CPSO# 79597 )
Dr. A. Nasirzadeh ( CPSO# 93879 )
Dr. A. Menard ( CPSO# 79021 )
Dr. I. Silver ( CPSO# 79178 )
Dr. J. Flood ( CPSO# 81434 )
Dr. X. Wang ( CPSO# 86450 )
Dr. R. Butler ( CPSO# 86184 )
Dr. G. Dhillon ( CPSO# 84503 )
Dr. E. Sauerbrei ( CPSO# 28818 )
Dr. P. Fenton ( CPSO# 54474 )
Dr. F. Cheeseman ( CPSO# 59183 )
Dr. D. Soboleski ( CPSO# 59427 )
Dr. J. Ricketts ( CPSO# 66593 )
Dr. B. Mussari ( CPSO# 65429 )
Dr. O. Islam ( CPSO# 69179 )
Dr. C. Abraham ( CPSO# 70151 )
Dr. D. Rumbolt ( CPSO# 93048 )
Dr. D. Jabs ( CPSO# 70253 )
Dr. D. Dabreo ( CPSO# 93188 )

Business Address:
776 Blackburn Mews East
Kingston ON  K7P 2N7
Phone Number: (613) 384-1220

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 549-6666

Business Address:
HDH
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3310

Business Address:
SMOL 752 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 4X3
Phone Number: (613) 546-1101

Business Address:
191 Portsmouth Avenue
Kingston ON  K7M 8A6
Phone Number: (613) 548-4417

Business Address:
835 Princess Street
Kingston ON  K7L 1G7
Phone Number: (613) 549-8775


Corporation Name: D.K. Jabs Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 22 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Jabs ( CPSO# 70253 )

Business Address:
OBSP
490 Discovery Avenue
Kingston ON  K7L 5A2
Phone Number: (613) 384-4284

Business Address:
Perth Smiths Falls District Hospital
60 Cornelia Street West
Smiths Falls ON  K7A 2H9
Phone Number: (613) 283-2330

Business Address:
KMRI/KMI
776 Blackburn Mews
Kingston ON  K7P 2N7
Phone Number: (613) 384-1220

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 548-2301

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3400

Business Address:
Providence Care Centre
St. Mary's of the Lake Hospital
340 Union Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5A2
Phone Number: (613) 544-5220


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital,Great War Memorial Site-Perth Perth
Providence Care Hospital Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DORIS KIRSTEN JABS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JABS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2001