skip to content

Ynoe de Moraes, Fabio

CPSO#: 108567

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Jan 2019
EXPIRY DATE
30 Jun 2022
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 15 Jan 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Portuguese, Spanish

Education:Faculdade de Medicina de Marilia, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Oncology
25 King St W
Kingston ON  K7L 5P9
Phone: 6135496666 Ext. 6645
Fax: 6135482399 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: de Metz Mahmud Brundage Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 22 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Brundage ( CPSO# 52901 )
Dr. C. de Metz ( CPSO# 57842 )
Dr. C. Shenfield ( CPSO# 65985 )
Dr. M. Kalyvas ( CPSO# 73427 )
Dr. C. Falkson ( CPSO# 76042 )
Dr. T. Hanna ( CPSO# 81017 )
Dr. A. Mahmud ( CPSO# 81278 )
Dr. K. Zaza ( CPSO# 81879 )
Dr. A. Ashworth ( CPSO# 83277 )
Dr. T. Owen ( CPSO# 90402 )
Dr. M. Korzeniowski ( CPSO# 95051 )
Dr. F. Ynoe de Moraes ( CPSO# 108567)

Business Address:
Cancer Centre of Southeastern Ontario
25 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 5P9
Phone Number: (613) 544-2631


Corporation Name: YNOE DE MORAES MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 25 2021

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Ynoe de Moraes ( CPSO# 108567)

Business Address:
27 Faircrest Blvd
Kingston ON  K7L 4V1
Phone Number: 6472916646


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Brazil

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective:15 Jan 2019 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2016 to 08 Apr 2016
PEAP - CF - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 09 Apr 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 28 Feb 2017
CF - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 26 Dec 2018
CF - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Apr 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Dec 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2019
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2022

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 15 Jan 2019 Active
 1.    Dr. Fabio Ynoe de Moraes may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Oncology,
                        Queen's  University,  in which Dr. Ynoe de Moraes holds an academic
                        appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration  automatically  expires  seven years from
                  the  date  of  issuance  or when Dr. Ynoe de Moraes no longer  holds  the
                  academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration  automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee  renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating  that  Dr. Ynoe de Moraes'
                        clinical  performance,  knowledge,  skill,  judgment,  professional
                        conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  Committee  does  not receive an annual report  or  receives  a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes  a  decision  about  Dr.  Ynoe  de Moraes'
                        certificate   of   registration,  following  consideration  of  the
                        practice assessment report. 
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued  on  January 15, 2019, and expires on June 30,
                  2022.   Upon  renewal  of Dr. Ynoe de  Moraes'  academic  appointment  at
                  Queen's University, the  expiry  date  can  be  extended,  subject to the
                  limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.