skip to content

de Metz, Catherine Ellen

CPSO#: 57842

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 19 Aug 1998
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 19 Aug 1998

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta Faculty of Medicin, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cancer Centre of
South Eastern Ontario
at Kingston Health Sciences Centre
25 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 5P9
Phone: (613) 544-2631 Ext. 4144
Fax: (613) 548-1355 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: de Metz Mahmud Brundage Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 22 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Brundage ( CPSO# 52901 )
Dr. C. de Metz ( CPSO# 57842 )
Dr. C. Shenfield ( CPSO# 65985 )
Dr. S. Thain ( CPSO# 72665 )
Dr. M. Kalyvas ( CPSO# 73427 )
Dr. C. Falkson ( CPSO# 76042 )
Dr. T. Hanna ( CPSO# 81017 )
Dr. A. Mahmud ( CPSO# 81278 )
Dr. K. Zaza ( CPSO# 81879 )
Dr. A. Ashworth ( CPSO# 83277 )
Dr. T. Owen ( CPSO# 90402 )
Dr. M. Korzeniowski ( CPSO# 95051 )
Dr. F. Ynoe de Moraes ( CPSO# 108567)

Business Address:
Cancer Centre of Southeastern Ontario
25 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 5P9
Phone Number: (613) 544-2631


Corporation Name: Catherine de Metz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 27 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. C. de Metz ( CPSO# 57842 )

Business Address:
Cancer Centre of Southeastern Ontario at
Kingston General Hospital
25 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 5P9
Phone Number: (613) 544-2631

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective:15 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CATHERINE ELLEN DE METZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DE METZ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1987 to 31 Mar 1987
EL - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jan 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 1998