skip to content

Kucharczyk, Michael Jonathan

CPSO#: 98565

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: University College, Cork, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
25 King Street West
Kingston General Hospital
Division of Radiation Oncology
Burr 2
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: 6135496666 Ext. 4505
Fax: 6135482399 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Owen Ashworth Korzeniowski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 22 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. C. de Metz ( CPSO# 57842 )
Dr. C. Shenfield ( CPSO# 65985 )
Dr. M. Kalyvas ( CPSO# 73427 )
Dr. C. Falkson ( CPSO# 76042 )
Dr. T. Hanna ( CPSO# 81017 )
Dr. A. Mahmud ( CPSO# 81278 )
Dr. K. Zaza ( CPSO# 81879 )
Dr. A. Ashworth ( CPSO# 83277 )
Dr. T. Owen ( CPSO# 90402 )
Dr. M. Korzeniowski ( CPSO# 95051 )
Dr. M. Kucharczyk ( CPSO# 98565 )
Dr. F. Ynoe de Moraes ( CPSO# 108567)
Dr. M. Mushonga ( CPSO# 123492)

Business Address:
Cancer Centre of Southeastern Ontario
25 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 5P9
Phone Number: (613) 544-2631


Corporation Name: DR. MICHAEL KUCHARCZYK MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 31 2023

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Kucharczyk ( CPSO# 98565 )

Business Address:
25 King St W
Cancer Care Centre of SE Ontario
Kingston ON  K7L 5P9


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Nova Scotia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective:18 Apr 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MICHAEL JONATHAN KUCHARCZYK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUCHARCZYK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 24 Sep 2012
AVP - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 25 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2018