THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
07/05/24 16:05:26 PM
Kucharczyk, Michael Jonathan
CPSO#:
98565
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
21 Jun 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University College, Cork, 2012
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
25 West St
Kingston ON K7L 2S2
Phone: 613 549 6666 Ext. 4506
Fax: 613 548 2399
Electoral District: 06
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Nova Scotia
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Kingston Health Sciences Centre |
Kingston |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Radiation Oncology |
Effective:18 Apr 2018 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MICHAEL JONATHAN KUCHARCZYK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUCHARCZYK is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 24 Sep 2012
AVP - Radiation Oncology
McMaster University, 25 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Radiation Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 25 Sep 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Jun 2018 |