skip to content

Shenfield, Carey Burton

CPSO#: 65985

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 09 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Western University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston Regional Cancer Centre
25 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 5P9
Phone: (613) 544-2631 Ext. 4506 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: de Metz Mahmud Brundage Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 22 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Brundage ( CPSO# 52901 )
Dr. C. de Metz ( CPSO# 57842 )
Dr. C. Shenfield ( CPSO# 65985 )
Dr. S. Thain ( CPSO# 72665 )
Dr. M. Kalyvas ( CPSO# 73427 )
Dr. C. Falkson ( CPSO# 76042 )
Dr. T. Hanna ( CPSO# 81017 )
Dr. A. Mahmud ( CPSO# 81278 )
Dr. K. Zaza ( CPSO# 81879 )
Dr. A. Ashworth ( CPSO# 83277 )
Dr. T. Owen ( CPSO# 90402 )
Dr. M. Korzeniowski ( CPSO# 95051 )
Dr. F. Ynoe de Moraes ( CPSO# 108567)

Business Address:
Cancer Centre of Southeastern Ontario
25 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 5P9
Phone Number: (613) 544-2631


Corporation Name: Shenfield Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 28 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Shenfield ( CPSO# 64950 )
Dr. C. Shenfield ( CPSO# 65985 )

Business Address:
Brockville General Hospital
Emergency Room
75 Charles Street
Kingston ON  K6V 1S8
Phone Number: (613) 548-2333

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective:30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CAREY BURTON SHENFIELD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHENFIELD is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Oct 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 Jul 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2009