THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 2:35:42 AM
Shenfield, Carey Burton
CPSO#:
65985
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
09 Jul 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
09 Jul 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Kingston Regional Cancer Centre
25 King Street West
Kingston ON K7L 5P9
Phone: (613) 544-2631 Ext. 4506
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Kingston Health Sciences Centre |
Kingston |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Radiation Oncology |
Effective:30 Jun 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CAREY BURTON SHENFIELD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHENFIELD is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Sep 1992 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 23 Oct 1992 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jul 1993 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 11 Jul 1994 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Jul 2009 |