skip to content

Zaza, Khaled Osman Abdel-Fattah

CPSO#: 81879

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 12 Mar 2020
EXPIRY DATE
30 Jun 2022
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Academic Practice as of 12 Mar 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cairo, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Division of Radiation Oncology
25 King St W
Kingston ON  K7L 5P9
Phone: (613) 544-2631 Ext. 4173 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: de Metz Mahmud Brundage Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 22 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Brundage ( CPSO# 52901 )
Dr. C. de Metz ( CPSO# 57842 )
Dr. C. Shenfield ( CPSO# 65985 )
Dr. S. Thain ( CPSO# 72665 )
Dr. M. Kalyvas ( CPSO# 73427 )
Dr. C. Falkson ( CPSO# 76042 )
Dr. T. Hanna ( CPSO# 81017 )
Dr. A. Mahmud ( CPSO# 81278 )
Dr. K. Zaza ( CPSO# 81879 )
Dr. A. Ashworth ( CPSO# 83277 )
Dr. T. Owen ( CPSO# 90402 )
Dr. M. Korzeniowski ( CPSO# 95051 )
Dr. F. Ynoe de Moraes ( CPSO# 108567)

Business Address:
Cancer Centre of Southeastern Ontario
25 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 5P9
Phone Number: (613) 544-2631


Corporation Name: Khaled Zaza Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 27 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Zaza ( CPSO# 81879 )

Business Address:
Division of Radiation Oncology
Cancer Centre of Southeastern Ontario
Kingston General Hospital
25 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 5P9
Phone Number: (613) 544-2631

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective:15 Aug 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KHALED OSMAN ABDEL-FATTAH ZAZA may practise medicine only in a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the QUEEN'S UNIVERSITY in which Dr. ZAZA holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment at the rank of full or associate professor;

(2) Dr. ZAZA may practise medicine only to the extent required by the teaching or research requirements of the appointment referred to in clause (1);

(3) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. ZAZA no longer holds certification by the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada or the College of Family Physicians of Canada,

(ii) When Dr. ZAZA no longer holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment to the academic staff of an accredited medical school in Ontario at the rank of full or associate professor,

(iii) When Dr. ZAZA no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

NOTE: The expiry date of this certificate is 30 Jun 2022.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Sep 2004 to 28 Feb 2005
International Specialist Physician - Radiation Oncology

Queen's University, 30 May 2005 to 31 Dec 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 May 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Mar 2006
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Mar 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 06 Apr 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Mar 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Mar 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Mar 2020