skip to content

Ashworth, Allison Betty

CPSO#: 83277

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 19 Apr 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Pahl, Allison Betty (used until: 17 Sep 2007 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cancer Centre of Southeastern
Ontario
Kingston General Hospital
25 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 5P9
Phone: (613) 544-2631
Fax: (613) 548-1355 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: de Metz Mahmud Brundage Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 22 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Brundage ( CPSO# 52901 )
Dr. C. de Metz ( CPSO# 57842 )
Dr. C. Shenfield ( CPSO# 65985 )
Dr. S. Thain ( CPSO# 72665 )
Dr. M. Kalyvas ( CPSO# 73427 )
Dr. C. Falkson ( CPSO# 76042 )
Dr. T. Hanna ( CPSO# 81017 )
Dr. A. Mahmud ( CPSO# 81278 )
Dr. K. Zaza ( CPSO# 81879 )
Dr. A. Ashworth ( CPSO# 83277 )
Dr. T. Owen ( CPSO# 90402 )
Dr. M. Korzeniowski ( CPSO# 95051 )
Dr. F. Ynoe de Moraes ( CPSO# 108567)

Business Address:
Cancer Centre of Southeastern Ontario
25 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 5P9
Phone Number: (613) 544-2631


Corporation Name: Allison B. Ashworth Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 07 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Ashworth ( CPSO# 83277 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Cancer Centre of Southeastern Ontario
25 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 5P9
Phone Number: (613) 544-2631

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective:25 May 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ALLISON BETTY ASHWORTH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ASHWORTH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 08 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

Queen's University, 09 Jun 2009 to 08 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

Queen's University, 09 Jun 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 18 May 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

Western University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 May 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Apr 2013