skip to content

Mahmud, Aamer

CPSO#: 81278

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 27 Mar 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 27 Mar 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Punjab University, Pakistan, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cancer Center of South Eastern Onta
KHSC. Department of Oncology
25 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 5P9
Phone: (613) 544-2631 Ext. 6645
Fax: (613) 548-2399 Electoral District: 06

Additional Practice Location(s)

166 Brock st. - Hotel Dieu Hospital
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Canada
Phone: (613) 544-2631 Ext. 6645
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: de Metz Mahmud Brundage Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 22 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Brundage ( CPSO# 52901 )
Dr. C. de Metz ( CPSO# 57842 )
Dr. C. Shenfield ( CPSO# 65985 )
Dr. S. Thain ( CPSO# 72665 )
Dr. M. Kalyvas ( CPSO# 73427 )
Dr. C. Falkson ( CPSO# 76042 )
Dr. T. Hanna ( CPSO# 81017 )
Dr. A. Mahmud ( CPSO# 81278 )
Dr. K. Zaza ( CPSO# 81879 )
Dr. A. Ashworth ( CPSO# 83277 )
Dr. T. Owen ( CPSO# 90402 )
Dr. M. Korzeniowski ( CPSO# 95051 )
Dr. F. Ynoe de Moraes ( CPSO# 108567)

Business Address:
Cancer Centre of Southeastern Ontario
25 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 5P9
Phone Number: (613) 544-2631


Corporation Name: A. Mahmud Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 29 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Mahmud ( CPSO# 81278 )

Business Address:
Kingston Regional Cancer Centre
Department of Oncology
25 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 5P9
Phone Number: (613) 544-2631

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective:27 May 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2005
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Sep 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 27 Mar 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Mar 2009

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 27 Mar 2009 Active
             Dr.  Aamer  Muhmud  may  practise  medicine independently in Radiation Oncology
            only.