THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 6:48:28 AM
de Metz, Catherine Ellen
CPSO#:
57842
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
19 Aug 1998
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Aug 1998
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicin, 1983
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Cancer Centre of
South Eastern Ontario
at Kingston Health Sciences Centre
25 King Street West
Kingston ON K7L 5P9
Phone: (613) 544-2631 Ext. 4144
Fax: (613) 548-1355
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Kingston Health Sciences Centre |
Kingston |
Quinte Healthcare Corporation |
Belleville |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Radiation Oncology |
Effective:15 Nov 1988 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CATHERINE ELLEN DE METZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DE METZ is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1987 to 31 Mar 1987
EL - Radiation Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jan 1987 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Mar 1987 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Aug 1998 |