THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 17:28:40 PM
Ynoe de Moraes, Fabio
CPSO#:
108567
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jan 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
15 Jan 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Portuguese, Spanish
Education: Faculdade de Medicina de Marilia, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Oncology
25 King St W
Kingston ON K7L 5P9
Phone: 6135496666 Ext. 6645
Fax: 6135482399
Electoral District: 06
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Brazil
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Kingston Health Sciences Centre |
Kingston |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Radiation Oncology |
Effective:15 Jan 2019 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2016 to 08 Apr 2016
PEAP - CF - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 09 Apr 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 28 Feb 2017
CF - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 26 Dec 2018
CF - Radiation Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Mar 2016 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 09 Apr 2016 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 26 Dec 2018 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 15 Jan 2019 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2022 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration |
Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2025 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2022 |
|
Active |