skip to content

Dupuis, Paul

CPSO#: 60169

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 22 Jul 1988
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 22 Jul 1988

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Thunder Bay Regional HSC
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone: (807) 684-6000 Electoral District: 09

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Lansdell & Jacobson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 31 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Garnett ( CPSO# 95471 )
Dr. G. Francis ( CPSO# 71385 )
Dr. W. MacGregor ( CPSO# 69621 )
Dr. D. Wood ( CPSO# 69249 )
Dr. Y. Chow ( CPSO# 66746 )
Dr. M. Wiltshire ( CPSO# 65013 )
Dr. P. Dupuis ( CPSO# 60169 )
Dr. D. Yee ( CPSO# 59895 )
Dr. M. Powlowski ( CPSO# 57083 )
Dr. D. Mutrie ( CPSO# 30037 )
Dr. J. Smith ( CPSO# 91016 )
Dr. F. Sarrazin ( CPSO# 89299 )
Dr. M. Chang ( CPSO# 88444 )
Dr. J. VanderBurgh ( CPSO# 88595 )
Dr. S. Green ( CPSO# 86498 )
Dr. R. Coulombe ( CPSO# 85597 )
Dr. B. Jacobson ( CPSO# 83213 )
Dr. P. Martel ( CPSO# 75620 )
Dr. D. Savage ( CPSO# 103493)
Dr. T. Lai ( CPSO# 103634)
Dr. A. Exley ( CPSO# 95194 )
Dr. K. Lansdell ( CPSO# 93305 )
Dr. S. Chapman ( CPSO# 93976 )
Dr. M. Heringer ( CPSO# 98149 )

Business Address:
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4


Corporation Name: Dupuis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 07 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Dupuis ( CPSO# 60169 )

Business Address:
Thunder Bay Regional Hospital
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone Number: (807) 768-3646

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 03 Dec 1996 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 11 Dec 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. PAUL DUPUIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUPUIS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 1988
The CPSO will be closed for the statutory holiday on Monday, October 14, 2019. We will re-open at 8 a.m. on Tuesday, October 15.